EP2840780 - SOLID-STATE IMAGE CAPTURE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tohoku University 1-1 Katahira 2-chome Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states Tohoku University 1-1 Katahira 2-chome Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | ||
For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
Former [2015/09] | For all designated states Tohoku University 1-1 Katahira 2-chome Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | ||
For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGAWA, Shigetoshi c/o Tohoku University 1-1 Katahira 2-chome Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 02 /
AKAHANE, Nana Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 03 /
ADACHI, Satoru Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/45] |
Former [2015/09] | 01 /
SUGAWA, Shigetoshi c/o Tohoku University 1-1 Katahira 2-chome Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | ||
02 /
AKAHANE, Nana c/o Olympus Medical systems Corp. 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
ADACHI, Satoru c/o Olympus Medical systems Corp. 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13778037.5 | 04.04.2013 | WO2013JP60383 | Priority number, date | JP20120095784 | 19.04.2012 Original published format: JP 2012095784 | [2015/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013157407 | Date: | 24.10.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2840780 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/357, H04N5/3745, H04N5/378 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
H04N25/616 (EP,US);
H04N25/65 (KR,US);
H04N25/671 (EP);
H04N25/75 (US);
H04N25/76 (KR);
H04N25/767 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/09] | H04N5/363, H04N5/374 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Title | German: | FESTKÖRPERBILDERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2015/09] | English: | SOLID-STATE IMAGE CAPTURE DEVICE | [2015/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRISE DE VUE À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [2015/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2014 | Translation filed | 24.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 25.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.03.2019 | 12.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 20.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1014683 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]EP1207686 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [GB]); | [Y]US2005018065 (TASHIRO KAZUAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2012050594 (OKITA AKIRA [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2000295534 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2002344809 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2003259227 (CANON KK) | by applicant | JP2000004399 |