EP2839148 - TURBINE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 4Sphere LLC 7510 W. 85th Street Playa del Rey, CA 90293 / US | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATRICK, David, Michael 7510 W. 85th Street Playa del Rey, CA 90293 / US | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13778283.5 | 12.04.2013 | WO2013US36433 | Priority number, date | US201213450383 | 18.04.2012 Original published format: US201213450383 | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013158501 | Date: | 24.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2839148 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 24.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F03D3/06, F03D3/04, F03B3/00, F03D3/02, F03B3/12, F01D1/02 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
F03D5/00 (EP,US);
F03D3/0436 (EP,US);
F01D1/06 (US);
F03D3/061 (EP,US);
F03D3/062 (EP,US);
F03D13/20 (EP,US);
F03D15/00 (EP,US);
F03D9/25 (EP,US);
F03D9/32 (EP,US);
F05B2210/16 (EP,US);
F05B2250/241 (EP,US);
Y02E10/70 (EP,US);
Y02E10/74 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/09] | F03D3/06, F03D3/04, F03B3/00, F03D3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Title | German: | TURBINENANORDNUNG | [2015/09] | English: | TURBINE ASSEMBLY | [2015/09] | French: | ENSEMBLE TURBINE | [2015/09] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 25.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/16] | 05.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006068529 (PANU-MISAILESCU DUMITRU [RO]) [X] 1-4,9,13,14 * figures 9,20; claim 4 * * page 4, line 29 - line 30; figure 6 *[I] 15 | International search | [A]US4074951 (HUDSON GERALD E); | [A]SU1511458 (TADZHIK NI OTDEL ENERGETIKI [SU]); | [A]DE19521740 (AHRENS HANS JOACHIM DIPL PHYS [DE], et al) | by applicant | WO2006068529 |