EP2912544 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING MULTIMEDIA DATA IN A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÜGER, Martin Schloßkamp 2 38550 Isenbüttel / DE | [2015/36] | Application number, filing date | 13779152.1 | 26.09.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013EP70026 | Priority number, date | DE20121020974 | 25.10.2012 Original published format: DE102012020974 | [2015/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014063896 | Date: | 01.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2912544 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2912544 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, H04W88/02, H04L29/08, H04L29/06, B60K37/00 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
G06F40/143 (EP,US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (US);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04W4/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG MULTIMEDIALER DATEN IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2015/36] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING MULTIMEDIA DATA IN A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2015/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉSENTATION DE DONNÉES MULTIMÉDIA DANS UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR | [2015/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 24.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2013 | AL | 10.01.2018 | CY | 10.01.2018 | DK | 10.01.2018 | EE | 10.01.2018 | ES | 10.01.2018 | FI | 10.01.2018 | HR | 10.01.2018 | IT | 10.01.2018 | LT | 10.01.2018 | LV | 10.01.2018 | MC | 10.01.2018 | MK | 10.01.2018 | MT | 10.01.2018 | NL | 10.01.2018 | PL | 10.01.2018 | PT | 10.01.2018 | RO | 10.01.2018 | RS | 10.01.2018 | SE | 10.01.2018 | SI | 10.01.2018 | SK | 10.01.2018 | SM | 10.01.2018 | TR | 10.01.2018 | BG | 10.04.2018 | NO | 10.04.2018 | GR | 11.04.2018 | IS | 10.05.2018 | AT | 26.09.2018 | IE | 26.09.2018 | LU | 26.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 26.09.2013 | |
AL | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 26.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 26.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 26.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 26.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
IE | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 26.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
IE | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 26.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
IE | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 26.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 26.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 10.01.2018 | |
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XDI] - JAHNICH ET AL., "Integrating Dynamic Load Balancing Strategies into the Car-Network", 4TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ELECTRONIC DESIGN, TEST AND APPLICATIONS, (2008), XP002716064 [XD] 1-4,6,8,10,13-15 * page 435, column 1 - page 438, column 2; figures 1-3 * [I] 5,7,9,11,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/delta.2008.89 | [IA] - Qnx Software Systems, "QNX CAR 2.0 for EcoCAR 2", (20120906), URL: https://community.freescale.com/servlet/JiveServlet/previewBody/96203-102-1-9168/QNX%20CAR%202%20for%20EcoCar.pdf, (20131107), XP055087103 [I] 1,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 2-12 | [A] - Andy Gryc ET AL, "Warum HTML5 die HMI-Technologie der Zukunft ist", (20120718), URL: http://www.qnx.com/download/download/23790/qnx_html5_hmi_de.pdf, (20131107), XP055087122 [A] 5,12 * the whole document * | by applicant | - BOSE, R. ET AL., "Morphing Smartphones into Automotive Application Platforms", COMPUTER, (201105), vol. 44, no. 5, pages 53 - 61 |