EP2906423 - SEALANT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Opposition rejected | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPUR, Mridula 235 Dewberry Drive Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 02 /
DEMIRORS, Mehmet 2319 Bending Spring Drive Pearland, TX 77584 / US | 03 /
JAIN, Pradeep 103 River Oaks Drive Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 04 /
GAUBERT, Joshua 11410 Rashell Way Pearland, TX 77584 / US | 05 /
GINGER, Douglas S. 1302 Arthur St. Houston, TX 77019 / US | 06 /
BILGEN, Mustafa 24 Oakland Park Dr. Manvel, TX 77578 / US | 07 /
SAINI, Gagan 2601 Gramercy St Apt. 2301 Houston, TX 77030 / US | 08 /
TURNER, Michael D. 3430 Mimosa Way Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 13779661.1 | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] | WO2013US62597 | Priority number, date | US201261711513P | 09.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261711513 P | US201261715105P | 17.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261715105 P | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014058639 | Date: | 17.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2906423 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2906423 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/00, C08J5/00, C08L23/08 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
C09K3/10 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B65D85/70 (US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
B32B2250/24 (US);
B32B2439/70 (US);
C08F2410/04 (EP,US);
C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/025 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C09K2200/062 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F2/001 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/64144 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/64193 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65904 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/08, C08F2500/10, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/19, C08F2500/26 (EP,US)
(-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSMASSE | [2016/49] | English: | SEALANT COMPOSITION | [2015/34] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/34] | DICHTUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 13.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.03.2018
12.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Borealis AG Trabrennstrasse 6-8 1020 Vienna / AT Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/04] |
Former [2022/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.03.2018
12.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Borealis AG Trabrennstrasse 6-8 1020 Vienna / AT Opponent's representative Maiwald, Walter Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2018/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Borealis AG IZD Tower Wagramerstrasse 17-19 1220 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Maiwald, Walter Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | 21.03.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.09.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.12.2019 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 20.03.2023 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2023/23] | Appeal following opposition | 14.02.2020 | Appeal received No. T0382/20 | 15.04.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.03.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 25.04.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 20.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2013 | AL | 07.06.2017 | AT | 07.06.2017 | CY | 07.06.2017 | CZ | 07.06.2017 | DK | 07.06.2017 | EE | 07.06.2017 | FI | 07.06.2017 | HR | 07.06.2017 | IT | 07.06.2017 | LT | 07.06.2017 | LV | 07.06.2017 | MC | 07.06.2017 | MK | 07.06.2017 | PL | 07.06.2017 | PT | 07.06.2017 | RO | 07.06.2017 | RS | 07.06.2017 | SE | 07.06.2017 | SI | 07.06.2017 | SK | 07.06.2017 | SM | 07.06.2017 | TR | 07.06.2017 | BG | 07.09.2017 | NO | 07.09.2017 | GR | 08.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | GB | 30.09.2017 | IE | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | LU | 30.09.2017 | MT | 30.09.2017 | IS | 07.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 30.09.2013 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
GB | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
MT | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.09.2013 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
GB | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
MT | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 30.09.2013 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
GB | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
MT | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 30.09.2013 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
GB | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
MT | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.09.2013 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
GB | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
MT | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
GB | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
MT | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
GB | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
GB | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 07.06.2017 | |
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 07.06.2017 | |
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006199030 (LIANG WENBIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *; | [X]WO2011109563 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2012061168 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *; | [E]WO2014003926 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [E] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | US5504172 | WO0001745 | US6525157 | US6953764 | US6960635 | WO2009067337 | US2010285253 | - WILLIAMS; WARD, J. POLYM. SCI., POLYM. LETTERS, (1968), vol. 6, page 621 | - B MONRABAL ET AL., MACROMOL. SYMP., (2007), vol. 257, pages 71 - 79 | Opposition | WO0202323 | WO03066699 | EP1674490 | EP1638695 | WO2011002868 | WO2011002986 | US2011172354 | WO2011109563 | WO2011146468 | WO2011159376 | WO2012061168 | WO2014003927 | WO2014003923 | WO2014012250 | WO2016003880 | - Dow Dowlex, "Dow DOWLEX ™ 2045 Linear Low Density Polyethylene, Heavy Duty Film Grade", Data Sheet | - DELGADILLO-VELAZQUEZ, O. et al., "Thermorheological properties of LLDPE/LDPE blends: Effects of production technology of LLDPE", Journal of Polymer Science Part B, (20080000), pages 1669 - 1683, XP055472221 | - Dow Chemical Company, "Dowlex ™ 2045G Polyethylene Resin", Dow Technical Information, (20130118), pages 1 - 3, XP055472226 | - Nuttawat Chokputtanawuttilerd, Siripon Anantawaraskul, Nantiya Inwong, Joao B.P. Soares, "Mathematical Modeling of Crystallization Elution Fractination of Ethyle/1-Octene Copolymers", Macromolecular Chemistry and Physics, (20140000), vol. 216, pages 621 - 635, XP055472235 | - A. Willem deGroot, David Gillespie, Rongjuan Cong, Zhe Zhou, and Rajesh Paradkar, "Chapter 5 Molecular Structural Characterization of Polyethylene", A. Willem deGroot, David Gillespie, Rongjuan Cong, Zhe Zhou, and Rajesh Paradkar, SPALDING, Mark A.; CHATTERJEE, Ananda, Handbook of Industrial Polyethylene and Technology: Definitive Guide to Manufacturing, Properties, Processing, Applications and Markets, John Wiley & Sons,, (20170000), XP055472245 | - Paula M. Wood-Adams, John M. Dealy,, "Effect of molecular structure on the linear viscoelastic behavior of polyethylene", Macromolecules, (20000000), vol. 33, no. 20, pages 7489 - 7499, XP055472256 | - MALMBERG ANNELI; ET AL, "Long-chain branched polyethene polymerized by metallocene catalysts Et [Ind] 2ZrC12/MAO and Et [IndH4] 2ZrCI2/MAO", Macromolecules, (19980000), vol. 31, no. 24, pages 8448 - 8454, XP002336253 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma980522n | - PAULA M. WOOD-ADAMS, et al., "Using rheological data to determine the branching level in metallocene polyethylenes", Macromolecules, (20000000), vol. 33, no. 20, pages 7481 - 7488, XP055472258 | - YANG, QING et al., "Alternative view of long chain branch formation by metallocene catalysts", Macromolecules, (20101109), vol. 43, no. 21, pages 8836 - 8852, XP001559001 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma101469j | - SCHURE, MARK R. et al., "How does column packing microstructure affect column efficiency in liquid chromatography?", Journal of Chromatography A, (20060000), vol. 1126, no. 1-2, pages 58 - 69, XP005615331 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2006.05.066 | - "Performance Specifications", 1200 Series Isocratic Pump User Manual, page 22 |