EP2906121 - QUANTITATIVE SPECTRAL IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROKSA, Roland c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Versteeg, Dennis John Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | Versteeg, Dennis John Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 13780413.4 | 02.10.2013 | [2015/34] | WO2013IB59060 | Priority number, date | US201261711428P | 09.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261711428 P | US201261711559P | 09.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261711559 P | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014057394 | Date: | 17.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2906121 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, G01T1/00 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
A61B6/4014 (EP,US);
G06T11/60 (US);
A61B6/4241 (EP,US);
A61B6/463 (EP,US);
A61B6/482 (EP,US);
A61B6/5217 (EP,US);
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
G06T5/70 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Title | German: | QUANTITATIVE SPEKTRALBILDGEBUNG | [2015/34] | English: | QUANTITATIVE SPECTRAL IMAGING | [2015/34] | French: | IMAGERIE SPECTRALE QUANTITATIVE | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 22.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 25.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5910972 (OHKUBO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,12,20 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * [I] 2-11,13-19; | [XI]US2003215119 (UPPALURI RENUKA [US], et al) [X] 1,12,20 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050] * [I] 2-11,13-19; | [A] - SCHMIDT TALY, "Optimal "image-based" weighting for energy-resolved CT", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20090610), vol. 36, no. 7, doi:10.1118/1.3148535, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 3018 - 3027, XP012130093 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * section "II. A. 2 Image-based optimal energy weighting" * * section "III. Results" * * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.3148535 |