EP2843943 - MULTIVIEW VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND DEVICE, AND MULTIVIEW VIDEO DECODING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Byeong-doo 203-801 Cheonggu 2-cha Apt. Daeya-dong Siheung-si Gyeonggi-do 429-010 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jae-hyun 1-401 Gungjoen Apt. Banpo-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-040 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Jeong-hoon 110-1506 Dong-a Apt. Bongcheon 2-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-050 / KR | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Jones, Ithel Rhys Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13780629.5 | 23.04.2013 | WO2013KR03471 | Priority number, date | US201261636874P | 23.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261636874 P | [2015/10] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013162258 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2843943 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, H04N19/597, H04N19/46 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N21/434 (KR);
H04N13/10 (US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/10] | H04N7/26, H04N13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Title | German: | MEHRANSICHTSVIDEOCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE MEHRANSICHTSVIDEODECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2015/10] | English: | MULTIVIEW VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND DEVICE, AND MULTIVIEW VIDEO DECODING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2015/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE DE VIDÉO MULTIVUE, ET PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE DE VIDÉO MULTIVUE | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2014 | Translation filed | 21.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 06.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - CHOI B ET AL, "POC signalling for CRA picture", 9. JCT-VC MEETING; 100. MPEG MEETING; 27-4-2012 - 7-5-2012; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120416), no. JCTVC-I0133, XP030111896 [X] 1,7,13,15 * the whole document * [I] 1-15 | [XI] - NAKAMURA H ET AL, "MVC using existing AVC decoder", 24. JVT MEETING; 81. MPEG MEETING; 29.6.2007 - 5.7.2006; GENEVA, CH;(JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20070703), no. JVT-X039, ISSN 0000-0152, XP030007146 [X] 1,7,13,15 * the whole document * [I] 1-15 | [A] - KOYAMA J ET AL, "Cyclic POC", 9. JCT-VC MEETING; 100. MPEG MEETING; 27-4-2012 - 7-5-2012; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120416), no. JCTVC-I0045, XP030111808 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20080114500 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al); | [A]KR100941608B (UNIVERSITY-INDUSTRY COOPERATION GROUP OF KYUNG HEE UNIVERSITY); | [A]KR20110019322 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al); | [A]KR20110113583 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20120019751 (ACETEL CO LTD [KR]) |