EP2841381 - MITIGATING LEACHING OF ARSENIC AND ANTIMONY FROM ACTIVATED CARBON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CALGON CARBON CORPORATION 500 Calgon Carbon Drive Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15205 / US | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAUGHN, Robert H. 5819 Southampton Drive Bethel Park, Pennsylvania 15102 / US | 02 /
DISTEFANO, Rebecca L. 500 Calgon Carbon Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15205 / US | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/10] | Application number, filing date | 13780643.6 | 24.04.2013 | WO2013US37980 | Priority number, date | US201261638285P | 25.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261638285 P | US201313842818 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313842818 | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013163288 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2841381 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/08, C02F1/28 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
B01J20/3071 (EP,US);
B01J20/20 (EP,US);
B01J20/3085 (EP,US);
C02F1/281 (US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
C02F1/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Title | German: | ABSCHWÄCHUNG DER AUSLAUGUNG VON ARSEN UND ANTIMON AUS AKTIVKOHLE | [2015/10] | English: | MITIGATING LEACHING OF ARSENIC AND ANTIMONY FROM ACTIVATED CARBON | [2015/10] | French: | RÉDUCTION DE LA LIXIVIATION DE L'ARSENIC ET DE L'ANTIMOINE DEPUIS UN CHARBON ACTIF | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/15] | 04.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5368738 (DUSSERT BERTRAND W [US], et al); | [A]JP4272586B (EBARA CORP.); | [A]WO02058813 (ENVIROTROL INC [US]); | [A]JPH08141553 (CALGON CARBON CORP) |