EP2842926 - LITHIUM LANTHANUM TITANIUM OXIDE SINTERED BODY, SOLID ELECTROLYTE CONTAINING OXIDE, LITHIUM AIR BATTERY EMPLOYING SOLID ELECTROLYTE AND ALL-SOLID LITHIUM BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toho Titanium Co., Ltd. 3-5, Chigasaki 3-chome Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 253-8510 / JP | For all designated states Nakashima Sangyo Co., Ltd. 35 Higashikoseto-cho Seto-shi Aichi 489-0037 / JP | For all designated states The Gakushuin School Corporation 1-5-1 Mejiro Toshima-ku Tokyo 171-8588 / JP | [2018/48] |
Former [2015/10] | For all designated states Toho Titanium Co., Ltd. 3-3-5, Chigasaki Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 253-8510 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nakashima Sangyo Co., Ltd. 35 Higashikoseto-cho Seto-shi Aichi 489-0037 / JP | |||
For all designated states The Gakushuin School Corporation 1-5-1 Mejiro Toshima-ku Tokyo 171-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKASHIMA, Mamoru c/o TOHO TITANIUM CO., LTD. 3-5, Chigasaki 3-chome Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 253-8510 / JP | 02 /
INAGUMA, Yoshiyuki c/o THE GAKUSHUIN SCHOOL CORPORATION GAKUSHUIN UNIVERSITY 1-5-1 Mejiro Toshima-ku Tokyo 171-8588 / JP | 03 /
NAKASHIMA, Mikio c/o NAKASHIMA SANGYO CO., LTD. 35 Higashikoseto-cho Seto-shi Aichi 489-0037 / JP | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2015/10] | Application number, filing date | 13780889.5 | 22.04.2013 | [2018/48] | WO2013JP61795 | Priority number, date | JP20120099456 | 25.04.2012 Original published format: JP 2012099456 | JP20120167432 | 27.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012167432 | [2015/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013161765 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2842926 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2842926 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/462, C04B35/47, C04B35/64, C04B35/495, H01M10/0525, H01M10/0562, H01M12/08, C01G23/00, C01G35/00, C01G49/00, // H01B1/06 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
H01M10/0562 (EP,US);
C01G23/005 (EP,US);
C01G23/006 (EP,US);
C01G35/006 (EP,US);
C01G49/0054 (EP,US);
C04B35/462 (EP,US);
C04B35/47 (EP,US);
C04B35/495 (EP,US);
C04B35/64 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M12/08 (EP,US);
C01P2002/50 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3201 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3203 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3213 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3227 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3236 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3255 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3272 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3286 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/661 (EP,US);
C04B2235/786 (EP,US);
C04B2235/80 (EP,US);
C04B2235/81 (EP,US);
H01B1/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | C04B35/46, C04B35/50, H01B1/06, H01M10/00, H01M12/06, H01M12/08, C01G23/00, C04B35/462, C04B35/47, C04B35/64, H01M10/0562, C04B35/495, H01M10/0525 | ||
Former IPC [2015/10] | C04B35/46, C04B35/50, H01B1/06, H01M10/00, H01M12/06, H01M12/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LITHIUM-LANTHAN-TITANOXID-SINTERKÖRPER, FESTELEKTROLYT MIT OXID, LITHIUM-LUFT-BATTERIE MIT DEM FESTELEKTROLYT UND LITHIUMFESTKÖRPERBATTERIE | [2015/10] | English: | LITHIUM LANTHANUM TITANIUM OXIDE SINTERED BODY, SOLID ELECTROLYTE CONTAINING OXIDE, LITHIUM AIR BATTERY EMPLOYING SOLID ELECTROLYTE AND ALL-SOLID LITHIUM BATTERY | [2015/10] | French: | CORPS FRITTÉ À BASE D'OXYDE DE LITHIUM, DE LANTHANE ET DE TITANE, ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE CONTENANT UN OXYDE, BATTERIE LITHIUM-AIR UTILISANT L'ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE ET BATTERIE AU LITHIUM À L'ÉTAT SOLIDE | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2014 | Translation filed | 25.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 28.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2013 | AL | 28.11.2018 | AT | 28.11.2018 | CY | 28.11.2018 | CZ | 28.11.2018 | DK | 28.11.2018 | EE | 28.11.2018 | ES | 28.11.2018 | FI | 28.11.2018 | HR | 28.11.2018 | LT | 28.11.2018 | LV | 28.11.2018 | MC | 28.11.2018 | MK | 28.11.2018 | MT | 28.11.2018 | NL | 28.11.2018 | PL | 28.11.2018 | RO | 28.11.2018 | RS | 28.11.2018 | SE | 28.11.2018 | SI | 28.11.2018 | SK | 28.11.2018 | SM | 28.11.2018 | TR | 28.11.2018 | BG | 28.02.2019 | NO | 28.02.2019 | GR | 01.03.2019 | IS | 28.03.2019 | PT | 28.03.2019 | IE | 22.04.2019 | LU | 22.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.04.2013 | |
AL | 28.11.2018 | ||
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
MT | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 22.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 22.04.2013 | |
AL | 28.11.2018 | ||
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 22.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 22.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 22.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 28.11.2018 | |
NO | 28.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2093824 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 4,7 * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0102]; example 1 *; | [IY] - HONGXIA GENG ET AL, "Effect of sintering temperature on microstructure and transport properties of LiLaTiOwith different lithium contents", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, vol. 56, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.ELECTACTA.2010.06.031, ISSN 0013-4686, (20100611), pages 3406 - 3414, (20100617), XP028371720 [I] 1-3 * abstract * * table 1 * * figures 1, 9, 10, 12, 13 * * Section 3, last paragraph; page 3413 * [Y] 4-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.electacta.2010.06.031 | [I] - YANG K Y ET AL, "Roles of lithium ions and La/Li-site vacancies in sinterability and total ionic conduction properties of polycrystalline Li3xLa2/3-xTiO3 solid electrolytes (0.21@?3x@?0.50)", JOURNAL OF ALLOYS AND COMPOUNDS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 458, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.JALLCOM.2007.03.130, ISSN 0925-8388, (20080630), pages 415 - 424, (20080507), XP022647546 [I] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 6, 7, 11 * * 2.1 Powder preparation * * Left column, second paragraph; page 423 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jallcom.2007.03.130 | [Y] - WANG Y ET AL, "A lithium-air battery with a potential to continuously reduce O2 from air for delivering energy", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH, vol. 195, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JPOWSOUR.2009.06.109, ISSN 0378-7753, (20100101), pages 358 - 361, (20090718), XP026564903 [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2009.06.109 | [A] - MEI A ET AL, "Role of amorphous boundary layer in enhancing ionic conductivity of lithium-lanthanum-titanate electrolyte", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, vol. 55, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.ELECTACTA.2010.01.036, ISSN 0013-4686, (20100301), pages 2958 - 2963, (20100118), XP026908883 [A] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.electacta.2010.01.036 | [A] - KATSUMATA T ET AL, "Influence of site percolation and local distortion on lithium ion conductivity in perovskite-type oxides La0.55Li0.35-xKxTiO3 and La0.55Li0.35TiO3-KMO3 (M = Nb and Ta)", SOLID STATE IONICS, NORTH HOLLAND PUB. COMPANY. AMSTERDAM; NL, NL, (19960701), vol. 86-88, doi:10.1016/0167-2738(96)00116-6, ISSN 0167-2738, pages 165 - 169, XP004070000 [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-2738(96)00116-6 | [A] - ISHIKAWA YOSHITAKA ET AL, "Effects of the framework of Li-ADPESSs on lithium ion conductivity", KEY ENGINEERING MATERIALS, TRANS TECH PUBLICATIONS LTD., STAFA-ZURICH, CH, (20000101), vol. 181-182, ISSN 1013-9826, pages 171 - 174, XP008133876 [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - M KLINGLER ET AL, "Coulometric titration of substituted LixLa(2-x)/3 TiO3", IONICS, DE, (19970501), vol. 3, no. 3, doi:10.1007/BF02375631, ISSN 0947-7047, pages 289 - 291, XP055228751 [A] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02375631 | [A] - ELENA A. FORTALNOVA ET AL, "The Ion Conducting Properties of Perovskite-Type Solid Solutions (La0.5Li0.5) [Ti1-x(M0.5Nb0.5)x]O3 (M = Al, Ga)", MATERIALS SCIENCE FORUM, (20060515), vol. 514-516, doi:10.4028/www.scientific.net/MSF.514-516.407, pages 407 - 411, XP055228748 [A] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4028/www.scientific.net/MSF.514-516.407 | International search | [Y]JPH07169456 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [X]JP2008112661 (OHARA KK); | [XP] - INAGUMA,YOSHIYUKI ET AL., "A rechargeable lithium-air battery using a lithium ion- conducting lanthanum lithium titanate ceramics as an electrolyte separator", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, (20121129), vol. 228, pages 250 - 255, XP028963194 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2012.11.098 | [A] - YOSHIYUKI INAGUMA, "Perovskite-Type Lithium Ion-Conducting Oxides", CERAMICS, (2008), vol. 43, no. 7, pages 540 - 546, XP008175332 | [A] - MEI,AO ET AL., "Enhanced ionic transport in lithium lanthanum titanium oxide solid state electrolyte by introducing silica", SOLID STATE IONICS, (2008), vol. 179, pages 2255 - 2259, XP025716254 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ssi.2008.08.013 | by applicant | JP2010262876 | JP2011134628 | JP2011222415 | US2011318650 | - Y. INAGUMA ET AL., SOLID STATE COMMUNICATIONS, (1993), vol. 689-693, page 86 | - A. MEI ET AL., SOLID STATE IONICS, (2008), vol. 2255-225, page 179 |