EP2842335 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SIGNALING INFORMATION IN A DIGITAL BROADCASTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Sung-Oh c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 02 /
MOURAD, Alain c/o Samsung Electronics Research Institute Communications House South Street Staines Middlesex TW18 4QE / GB | [2019/28] |
Former [2015/10] | 01 /
HWANG, Sung-Oh C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd Residence 129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | ||
02 /
MOURAD, Alain Samsung Electronics Research Institute Communications House South Street Staines Middlesex TW18 4QE / GB | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2015/10] | Application number, filing date | 13780961.2 | 25.04.2013 | [2019/28] | WO2013KR03572 | Priority number, date | US201261638169P | 25.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261638169 P | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013162305 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2842335 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2842335 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/23, H04H20/71, H04N21/61 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
H04N21/6131 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (KR);
H04N21/236 (KR);
H04N21/2362 (EP,US);
H04N21/43 (KR);
H04N21/643 (EP,US);
H04N21/64322 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/10] | H04N21/23, H04H20/71 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON SIGNALISIERUNGSINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM DIGITALEN RUNDFUNKSYSTEM | [2015/10] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SIGNALING INFORMATION IN A DIGITAL BROADCASTING SYSTEM | [2015/10] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA TRANSMISSION ET LA RÉCEPTION D'INFORMATION DE SIGNALISATION DANS UN SYSTÈME DE DIFFUSION NUMÉRIQUE | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 21.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2013 | AL | 10.07.2019 | AT | 10.07.2019 | CY | 10.07.2019 | CZ | 10.07.2019 | DK | 10.07.2019 | EE | 10.07.2019 | ES | 10.07.2019 | FI | 10.07.2019 | HR | 10.07.2019 | IT | 10.07.2019 | LT | 10.07.2019 | LV | 10.07.2019 | MC | 10.07.2019 | MK | 10.07.2019 | MT | 10.07.2019 | PL | 10.07.2019 | RO | 10.07.2019 | RS | 10.07.2019 | SE | 10.07.2019 | SI | 10.07.2019 | SK | 10.07.2019 | SM | 10.07.2019 | TR | 10.07.2019 | BG | 10.10.2019 | NO | 10.10.2019 | GR | 11.10.2019 | IS | 10.11.2019 | PT | 11.11.2019 | IE | 25.04.2020 | LU | 25.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | FR | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.04.2013 | |
AL | 10.07.2019 | ||
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
MT | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IE | 25.04.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IE | 25.04.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 10.07.2019 | |
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 10.07.2019 | |
NO | 10.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008109861 (XU YILING [KR], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [XI]EP2200210 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document * [I] 3-7,10-14; | [XI]WO2011122908 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document * [I] 3-7,10-14; | [XI]CA2824464 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0142] - [0188]; figure - * [I] 3-7,10-14; | [P]EP2555510 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | International search | [A]US2009079878 (LEE CHUL SOO [KR], et al); | [A]US2010290459 (LEE NAM-KYUNG [KR], et al); | [A]US2011051745 (LEE NAM-KYUNG [KR], et al); | [A]WO2011105096 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]US2012076127 (MOURAD ALAIN [GB], et al) | by applicant | WO2011122908 | CA2824464 |