EP2842075 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL FACE RECOGNITION FOR MOBILE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/01] |
Former [2015/10] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LV, Fengjun 1271 Poplar Avenue 306 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 02 /
KALKER, Ton 1378 Cuernavaca Circulo Mountain View, California 94040 / US | [2018/01] |
Former [2015/10] | 01 /
LV, Fengjun 1271 Poplar Avenue 306 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | ||
02 /
KALKER, Antonius 1378 Cuernavaca Circulo Mountain View, California 94040 / US | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13781046.1 | 22.04.2013 | [2018/01] | WO2013CN74511 | Priority number, date | US201213456074 | 25.04.2012 Original published format: US201213456074 | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013159686 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2842075 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2842075 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
G06T7/55 (EP,US);
G06V10/993 (EP,US);
G06V20/64 (EP,US);
G06V20/653 (EP,US);
G06V40/16 (EP,US);
G06V40/171 (EP,US);
G06V40/172 (EP,US);
G06V40/67 (EP,US);
G06T2200/24 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30201 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALE GESICHTSERKENNUNG FÜR MOBILE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2015/10] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL FACE RECOGNITION FOR MOBILE DEVICES | [2015/10] | French: | RECONNAISSANCE FACIALE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE POUR DISPOSITIFS MOBILES | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 24.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2013 | AL | 03.01.2018 | AT | 03.01.2018 | CY | 03.01.2018 | CZ | 03.01.2018 | DK | 03.01.2018 | EE | 03.01.2018 | ES | 03.01.2018 | FI | 03.01.2018 | HR | 03.01.2018 | IT | 03.01.2018 | LT | 03.01.2018 | LV | 03.01.2018 | MC | 03.01.2018 | MK | 03.01.2018 | NL | 03.01.2018 | PL | 03.01.2018 | PT | 03.01.2018 | RO | 03.01.2018 | RS | 03.01.2018 | SE | 03.01.2018 | SI | 03.01.2018 | SK | 03.01.2018 | SM | 03.01.2018 | TR | 03.01.2018 | BG | 03.04.2018 | NO | 03.04.2018 | GR | 04.04.2018 | IE | 22.04.2018 | LU | 22.04.2018 | MT | 22.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | IS | 03.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 22.04.2013 | |
AL | 03.01.2018 | ||
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PT | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 22.04.2018 | ||
LU | 22.04.2018 | ||
MT | 22.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 22.04.2018 | ||
LU | 22.04.2018 | ||
MT | 22.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 22.04.2018 | ||
LU | 22.04.2018 | ||
MT | 22.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 22.04.2018 | ||
LU | 22.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 22.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 22.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 03.01.2018 | |
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US6522787 (KUMAR RAKESH [US], et al) [I] 1,2,9,10 * figure 1 * [Y] 3,4,11,12; | [Y]US2003072474 (KIES JONATHAN K [US]) [Y] 3,4,11,12 * paragraph 24 *; | [Y]EP2137670 (FOTONATION VISION LTD [IE]) [Y] 2,10 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph 33 * * paragraph 59 *; | [XYI] - DOUGLAS FIDALEO ET AL, Model-Assisted 3D Face Reconstruction from Video, ANALYSIS AND MODELING OF FACES AND GESTURES; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 124 - 138, (20071020), ISBN 978-3-540-75689-7, XP019081553 [X] 1,9 * figure 1 * * section 4.1, paragraph 4, sentence 1; figure 2 * * section 4.1, paragraph 4, sentence 2 * * section 4.4, paragraph 3 * * section 3, last sentence * [Y] 2-4,10-12 [I] 5-8,13-16 | [Y] - RITA WONG ET AL, "Interactive quality-driven feedback for biometric systems", BIOMETRICS: THEORY APPLICATIONS AND SYSTEMS (BTAS), 2010 FOURTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100927), ISBN 978-1-4244-7581-0, pages 1 - 7, XP031800505 [Y] 3,4,11,12 * page 5, column 2 paragraph 2, sentence 3-4 * * page 5, column 2 paragraph 3, sentence 1 * | [IY] - MARTIN LABRIE ET AL, "Efficient camera motion and 3D recovery using an inertial sensor", COMPUTER AND ROBOT VISION, 2007. CRV '07. FOURTH CANADIAN CONFERE NCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20070501), ISBN 978-0-7695-2786-4, pages 55 - 62, XP031175788 [I] 1,2,9,10 * abstract * [Y] 3,4,11,12 | [IY] - KANADE T ET AL, "Real-time and 3D vision for autonomous small and micro air vehicles", 43RD IEEE CONFERENCE ON DECISION AND CONTROL; DECEMBER 14-17, 2004; ATLANTIS, PARADISE ISLAND, BAHAMAS, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20041214), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-8682-2, page 1655, XP010794491 [I] 1,2,9,10 * figure 2; section V, paragraph 2 * [Y] 3,4,11,12 | [A] - Richard Hartley ET AL, "Chapter 18.5.1: Direct solution for structure and translation", Multiple View Geometry in Computer Vision, Cambridge University Press, (20040404), pages 448 - 449, ISBN 978-0-52-154051-3, XP055184367 [A] 1,9 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2007116457 (LJUNG PETER [SE], et al); | [A]CN101377814 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]CN101395613 (UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US]); | [A]US2009279784 (ARCAS BLAISE AGUERA Y [US], et al); | [Y]US2011150300 (LEE HOU-HSIEN [TW], et al); | [A]US2012027270 (KYYKO VOLODYMYR [UA], et al) | Examination | - Alvin Ybañez, "FaceLock Android App Review: Locking down your phone apps and unlocking with your face", (20120420), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20120420050006/http://www.androidauthority.com/facelock-app-review-75802, (20160401), XP055262225 | - GONG S ET AL, Dynamic Vision: From Images to Face recognition, Databases, DYNAMIC VISION : FROM IMAGES TO FACE RECOGNITION, LONDON : IMPERIAL COLLEGE PRESS, GB, PAGE(S) 267 - 280, (20000101), ISBN 978-1-86094-181-8, XP002614932 | - SIMON CLIPPINGDALE ET AL, "Partial automation of database acquisition in the FAVRET face tracking and recognition system using a bootstrap approach", IAPR WORKSHOP ON MACHINE VISION APPLICATIONS, Tokyo, Japan, (20001130), XP055027899 | - Anonymous, "Accelerometer - Wikipedia", (20120421), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Accelerometer&oldid=488513625#Consumer_electronics, (20161130), XP055324902 | - MEDIONI G ET AL, "Generation of a 3-D face model from one camera", PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2002. PROCEEDINGS. 16TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON QUEBEC CITY, QUE., CANADA 11-15 AUG. 2002, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20020811), vol. 3, doi:10.1109/ICPR.2002.1048027, ISBN 978-0-7695-1695-0, pages 667 - 671, XP010613713 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.2002.1048027 | by applicant | EP2137670 | - DOUGLAS FIDALEO ET AL., MODEL-ASSISTED 3D FACE RECONSTRUCTION FROM VIDEO | - RITA WONG ET AL., INTERACTIVE QUALITY-DRIVEN FEEDBACK FOR BIOMETRIC SYSTEMS |