EP2841459 - ANTI-CD22 ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioatla, LLC 11085 Torreyana Road, Suite 100 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2018/35] |
Former [2015/10] | For all designated states Bioatla, LLC 11011 Torreyana Road San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHORT, Jay 12985 Via Esperia Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 02 /
FREY, Gerhard 13768 Via Cima Bella San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 03 /
CHANG, Hwai Wen 1318 Shadow Hills Drive San Marcos, CA 92069 / US | 04 /
BOYLE, William 23629 Malibu Colony Road Malibu, CA 90265-6628 / US | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Dunleavy, Kevin James Mendelsohn, Drucker and Dunleavy, P.C. p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 13781426.5 | 26.04.2013 | WO2013US38370 | Priority number, date | US201261638834P | 26.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261638834 P | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013163519 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2841459 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A01K67/027, C07K16/30, A61K39/00 | [2015/46] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/3061 (US);
A01K67/0275 (US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C07K16/2851 (US);
A01K2267/01 (US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/10] | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Title | German: | ANTI-CD22-ANTIKÖRPER | [2015/10] | English: | ANTI-CD22 ANTIBODIES | [2015/10] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-CD22 | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 14.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/21] | 12.04.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.09.2019 | 24.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5789554 (LEUNG SHUI-ON [US], et al) [A] 1-15; | [I]WO03093320 (CELLTECH R&D LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * table 8 *; | [I]WO2008070569 (MEDAREX INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 163; table 1 *; | [E]WO2014057118 (ADC THERAPEUTICS SARL [CH]) [E] 1-7,9,10,13,15 * page 94 - page 95 * * page 99 - page 100 * * page 184 - page 194 * * sequences 17-19, 20, 28, 49 *; | [A] - CARNAHAN ET AL, "Epratuzumab, a CD22-targeting recombinant humanized antibody with a different mode of action from rituximab", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, PERGAMON, GB, (20070201), vol. 44, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.MOLIMM.2006.05.007, ISSN 0161-5890, pages 1331 - 1341, XP005664750 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molimm.2006.05.007 | [A] - LEUNG S ET AL, "CONSTRUCTION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A HUMANIZED, INTERNALIZING, B-CELL (CD22)-SPECIFIC, LEUKEMIA/LYMPHOMA ANTIBODY, LL2", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, US, (19951201), vol. 32, no. 17/18, ISSN 0026-895X, pages 1413 - 1427, XP000942678 [A] 1-15 | International search | [A]US5789554 (LEUNG SHUI-ON [US], et al); | [A]WO03093320 (CELLTECH R&D LTD [GB], et al); | [A] - ARNDT, MICHAELA A. E. ET AL., "'Generation of a highly stable, internalizing anti-CD22 single-chain Fv fragment for targeting non-Hodgkin's lymphoma'", INT. J. CANCER, (20031210), vol. 107, no. 5, pages 822 - 829, XP003003811 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.11451 | [A] - GENBANK, (19981210), Database accession no. AAC92903.1, XP003033888 |