EP2842209 - ELONGATED MEMBER FOR SEALING OFF AN OPENING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/10] | FIBER OPTIC ENCLOSURES EMPLOYING CLAMPING ASSEMBLIES FOR STRAIN RELIEF OF CABLES, AND RELATED ASSEMBLIES AND METHODS | ||
[2018/46] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Optical Communications LLC 4200 Corning Place Charlotte, NC 28216 / US | [2020/02] |
Former [2015/10] | For all designated states Corning Optical Communications LLC 800 17th Street NW Hickory, NC 28601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEAMON, Hubert Blair 5028 Joy Lee Street Haltom, Texas 76117 / US | 02 /
COX, Terry Dean 2121 Red Brangus Trail Fort Worth, texas 76131 / US | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [2015/10] | Application number, filing date | 13781880.3 | 23.04.2013 | WO2013US37785 | Priority number, date | US201213456755 | 26.04.2012 Original published format: US201213456755 | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013163174 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2842209 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/013 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
G02B6/4428 (EP,CN,US);
G02B6/4248 (EP,CN,US);
G02B6/4471 (EP,CN,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Title | German: | LÄNGLICHES ELEMENT ZUR ABDICHTUNG EINER ÖFFNUNG | [2018/46] | English: | ELONGATED MEMBER FOR SEALING OFF AN OPENING | [2018/46] | French: | ÉLÉMENT ALLONGÉ POUR SCELLER UNE OUVERTURE | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/10] | GLASFASERGEHÄUSE MIT KLEMMANORDNUNGEN ZUR ZUGENTLASTUNG VON KABELN SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE ANORDNUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2015/10] | FIBER OPTIC ENCLOSURES EMPLOYING CLAMPING ASSEMBLIES FOR STRAIN RELIEF OF CABLES, AND RELATED ASSEMBLIES AND METHODS | ||
Former [2015/10] | BOÎTIERS DE FIBRES OPTIQUES FAISANT APPEL À DES ENSEMBLES SERRAGE PERMETTANT D'ATTÉNUER LES CONTRAINTES SUR LES CÂBLES, ET ENSEMBLES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 10.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 01.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 02.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2003010519 (PIECK AMANDUS [BE]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1,2,6 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0025] * [A] 4-15; | [YA]US6389214 (SMITH DUANE T [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 4, lines 16-42 * * figures 1A, 3-5 * [A] 4-15; | [A]WO0072072 (RAYCHEM SA NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2,3 * * page 4, lines 25-30 *; | [A]WO9522071 (MINIFLEX LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 10, lines 5-16 * * figure 9 * | International search | [Y]US2003010519 (PIECK AMANDUS [BE]); | [Y]EP1012642 (TYCO TELECOMM US INC [US]); | [Y]US6353186 (DAMS FRANCIS [BE], et al); | [Y]US5224187 (DAVISDON GARY A [US]); | [Y]US5778122 (GIEBEL MARKUS A [US], et al) | by applicant | US2003010519 | US6389214 | US2008166094 | US2009169163 |