EP2841955 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROTECTING POWER TRANSFORMERS FROM LARGE ELECTRO-MAGNETIC DISTURBANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Power Technologies, Inc. 215 State Route 10 Bldg. 2 Section 6 Randolph, NJ 07869 / US | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMAN, Gary, R. 32 Phyllis Place Randolph, NJ 07869 / US | 02 /
KWON, Edward, S. 2348 Linwood Ave. Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US | 03 /
CAI, Hong 228 Stewart Ave. Kearny, NJ 07032 / US | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Loven, Keith James LOVEN Patents & Trademarks Limited 51 Wragby Road Sudbrooke Lincoln, Lincolnshire LN2 2QU / GB | [2018/50] |
Former [2015/10] | Loven, Keith James LOVEN Patents & Trademarks Limited 3 Checkpoint Court Lincoln LN6 3PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 13781983.5 | 17.03.2013 | [2018/50] | WO2013US32734 | Priority number, date | US201261687459P | 25.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261687459 P | US201313736927 | 08.01.2013 Original published format: US201313736927 | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013162777 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2841955 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2841955 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/00, H02H5/00, H02H7/045, // H02H3/52, H02H3/08, H02H3/093 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
H02H5/005 (EP,US);
G01R31/62 (US);
G01R31/1227 (US);
H02H7/04 (US);
H02H7/0455 (EP,US);
H02H3/093 (EP,US);
H02H3/52 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/52] | G01R31/00, H02H5/00, H02H7/045, // H02H3/50, H02H3/08 | ||
Former IPC [2015/10] | G01R31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ VON STROMTRANSFORMATOREN VOR GROSSEN ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN STÖRUNGEN | [2015/10] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROTECTING POWER TRANSFORMERS FROM LARGE ELECTRO-MAGNETIC DISTURBANCES | [2015/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE PROTÉGER LES TRANSFORMATEURS ÉLECTRIQUES CONTRE DE GROSSES PERTURBATIONS ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUES | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 20.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2013 | AL | 12.12.2018 | CY | 12.12.2018 | CZ | 12.12.2018 | DK | 12.12.2018 | EE | 12.12.2018 | FI | 12.12.2018 | HR | 12.12.2018 | LT | 12.12.2018 | LV | 12.12.2018 | MC | 12.12.2018 | MK | 12.12.2018 | NL | 12.12.2018 | RO | 12.12.2018 | RS | 12.12.2018 | SI | 12.12.2018 | SK | 12.12.2018 | SM | 12.12.2018 | TR | 12.12.2018 | BG | 12.03.2019 | NO | 12.03.2019 | GR | 13.03.2019 | IE | 17.03.2019 | LU | 17.03.2019 | MT | 17.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | IS | 12.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 17.03.2013 | |
AL | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
MT | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
MT | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
MT | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 12.12.2018 | |
NO | 12.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5172329 (RAHMAN AZIZUR M [CA], et al) [I] 1-4,9,13-15* the whole document *; | [IA]US2012019962 (FAXVOG FREDERICK R [US], et al) [I] 1-4,8,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 5-7,9-12 | International search | [A]US5182547 (GRIFFITH DAVID C [US]); | [A]CN1632602 (UNIV NORTH CHINA ELEC POWER [CN]); | [A]US2010188240 (WELLS CHARLES H [US]); | [A]US2011295535 (LEWIS JAMES E [US], et al); | [A]US2012019965 (FAXVOG FREDERICK R [US], et al) |