EP2841559 - GLYCOENGINEERED OUTER MEMBRANE VESICLES AND USE THEREOF AS VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.10.2017 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Governors of the University of Alberta 4000 Enterprise Square 10230 Jasper Avenue Edmonton, Alberta T5J 4P6 / CA | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELDMAN, Mario 6167 Stinson Way Edmonton, Alberta T6R 0K3 / CA | 02 /
PRICE, Nancy 3043 116th Street Edmonton, Alberta T6J 3T2 / CA | 03 /
GARCIA-QUINTANILLA, Fatima C/Atanasio Barron 14 Portal 4 5A E-41003 Seville / ES | 04 /
IELMINI, Maria Veronica Tinogasta 2801 Buenos Aires C1417EHI / AR | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Turner, Rhiannon Rosalind, et al Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, BS27 3AH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome BA11 1BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 13782478.5 | 26.04.2013 | WO2013CA50322 | Priority number, date | US201261639340P | 27.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261639340 P | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013159234 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2841559 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/21, A61K39/02, A61K39/116, A61P31/04, A61P37/04, C12N15/52, C12N15/63, C12P19/00, C12P21/00, A61K39/09, C12P19/04, C12N15/70, A61K39/00 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
A61K39/092 (EP,US);
A61K39/0208 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C12N15/52 (EP,US);
C12N15/70 (US);
C12P19/04 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55555 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6018 (US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/10] | C12N1/21, A61K39/02, A61K39/116, A61P31/04, A61P37/04, C12N15/52, C12N15/63, C12P19/00, C12P21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Title | German: | MITTELS GLYCOENGINEERING HERGESTELLTE AUSSENMEMBRANVESIKEL UND VERWENDUNG DAVON ALS IMPFSTOFFE | [2015/10] | English: | GLYCOENGINEERED OUTER MEMBRANE VESICLES AND USE THEREOF AS VACCINES | [2015/10] | French: | VÉSICULES DE MEMBRANE EXTERNE GLYCOMODIFIÉES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME VACCINS | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 27.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2016 | Observations by third parties | 17.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2017 | 06.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/11] | 05.11.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009104074 (GLYCOVAXYN AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,9,10 * abstract, p. 3 line 14 - p. 5 line 25, p. 13 line 12 - p. 22 line 4, examples 1-10, claims 1-29 * [I] 4-8,11-15; | [XI]US2011274720 (WACKER MICHAEL [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10 * abstract, p. 5 paragraph [0027] - p. 6 paragraph [0038], examples 1-9 and claims * [I] 4,8,11-15; | [XA] - FARIDMOAYER A ET AL, "Extreme substrate promiscuity of the Neisseria oligosaccharyl transferase involved in protein O-glycosylation", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, (20081212), vol. 283, no. 50, doi:10.1074/JBC.M807113200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 34596 - 34604, XP002616754 [X] 1,3-5,7,9,10 * abstract, p. 34599 right-hand column second full paragraphp. 34601 right-hand column first paragraph, p. 34603 right-hand column last paragraph, Fig. 2-6 * [A] 2,6,8,11-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M807113200 | [XA] - MARIO F FELDMAN ET AL, "Engineering N-linked protein glycosylation with diverse O antigen lipopolysaccharide structures in Escherichia coli", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, vol. 102, no. 8, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0500044102, ISSN 0027-8424, (20050222), pages 3016 - 3021, (20050209), XP009121034 [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10 * abstract, p. 3018 left-hand column first full paragraph - 3rd full paragraph, p. 3018 right-hand column last paragraph - p. 3021 left-hand column line 20, p. 3021 right-hand column second full paragraph, Fig. 1-5 * [A] 3,6,8,11-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0500044102 | [XA] - GRANT E. HENDERSON ET AL, "Site-Specific Modification of Recombinant Proteins: A Novel Platform for Modifying Glycoproteins Expressed in E. coli", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY., US, (20110518), vol. 22, no. 5, doi:10.1021/bc100510g, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 903 - 912, XP055225248 [X] 1,3,8-10 * abstract, p. 906 left-hand column first-full paragraph - p. 908 left-hand column second full paragraph, paragraqph bridging p. 908 and 909, Fig. 2-4 and Tables 3-4 * [A] 2,4-7,11-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc100510g | [XA] - C. GEBHART ET AL, "Characterization of exogenous bacterial oligosaccharyltransferases in Escherichia coli reveals the potential for O-linked protein glycosylation in Vibrio cholerae and Burkholderia thailandensis", GLYCOBIOLOGY, (20120305), vol. 22, no. 7, doi:10.1093/glycob/cws059, ISSN 0959-6658, pages 962 - 974, XP055176525 [X] 1,3-5,7,9,10 * abstract, p. 963 right-hand column second full paragraph - p. 968 left-hand column line 9, paragraph bridging p. 971 to p. 972 and p. 972 left-hand column first full paragraph, Fig. 1- 6 and Table I * [A] 2,6,8,11-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/glycob/cws059 | [XAI] - A. C. FISHER ET AL, "Production of Secretory and Extracellular N-Linked Glycoproteins in Escherichia coli", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (20101203), vol. 77, no. 3, doi:10.1128/AEM.01901-10, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 871 - 881, XP055142701 [X] 1,2,5,7,9-13 * abstract, p. 872 left-hand column first full paragraph - right-hand column first full paragraph, p. 874 left-hand column first full paragraph lines 13-19, p. 876 paragraph bridging the left- to the right-hand column - p. 879 right-hand column line 14, p. 880 the paragraph bridging the left- to the right-hand column, Fig. 2-6 * [A] 3,4,6,8 [I] 14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.01901-10 | [A] - D. J. CHEN ET AL, "Delivery of foreign antigens by engineered outer membrane vesicle vaccines", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20100216), vol. 107, no. 7, doi:10.1073/pnas.0805532107, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3099 - 3104, XP055035314 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0805532107 | [A] - CRISTIAN J A ASENSIO ET AL, "Outer membrane vesicles obtained fromTohama expressing the lipid A deacylase PagL as a novel acellular vaccine candidate", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 29, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2010.12.068, ISSN 0264-410X, (20101216), pages 1649 - 1656, (20101222), XP028139985 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2010.12.068 | [A] - V. S. TERRA ET AL, "Recent developments in bacterial protein glycan coupling technology and glycoconjugate vaccine design", JOURNAL OF MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (20120419), vol. 61, no. Pt_7, doi:10.1099/jmm.0.039438-0, ISSN 0022-2615, pages 919 - 926, XP055107688 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/jmm.0.039438-0 | [A] - M. QUTYAN ET AL, "Glycosylation of Pilin and Nonpilin Protein Constructs by Pseudomonas aeruginosa 1244", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, US, (20101115), vol. 192, no. 22, doi:10.1128/JB.00007-10, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 5972 - 5981, XP055225244 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.00007-10 | [T] - WACKER MICHAEL ET AL, "Prevention of Staphylococcus aureus Infections by Glycoprotein Vaccines Synthesized in Escherichia coli", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES. JID, UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO PRESS, CHICAGO, IL, (20140501), vol. 209, ISSN 0022-1899, pages 1551 - 1561, XP009181722 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/infdis/jit800 | International search | [A]WO2008093165 (UNIV ALBERTA [CA], et al); | [X] - ASENSIO, C.J.A. ET AL., "Outer membrane vesicles obtained from Bordetella pertussis Tohama expressing the lipid A deacylase PagL as a novel acellular vaccine candidate.", VACCINE, (20110211), vol. 29, no. 8, pages 1649 - 1656, XP028139985 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2010.12.068 | [A] - FELDMAN, M.F. ET AL., "Engineering N-linked protein glycosylation with deverse O antigen lipopolysaccharide structures in Escherichia coli.", PNAS, (20050222), vol. 102, no. 8, pages 3016 - 3021, XP009121034 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0500044102 | [A] - CHEN, D.J. ET AL., "Delivery of foreign antigens by engineered outer membrane vesicle vaccines.", PNAS, (20100216), vol. 107, no. 7, pages 3099 - 3104, XP055035314 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0805532107 | [A] - GEBHART. C. ET AL., "Characterization of exogenous bacterial oligosaccharyltransferases in Escherichia coli reveals the potential for O-linked protein glycosylation in Vibrio cholerae and Burkhoderia thailandensis.", GLYCOBIOLOGY, (20120305), vol. 22, no. 7, pages 962 - 974, XP055176525 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/glycob/cws059 | other | WO2010108682 |