EP2912034 - 3,4-DISUBSTITUTED OXAZOLIDINONE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS INHIBITORS OF THE CALCIUM ACTIVATED POTASSIUM CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2017/22] |
Former [2015/36] | For all designated states F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Luke Oetlingerstrasse 52 CH-4057 Basel / CH | 02 /
WANG, Haiyan Brennerstrasse 54 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Schirlin, Julien F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG CLP - Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2015/36] | Application number, filing date | 13783333.1 | 25.10.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013EP72361 | Priority number, date | EP20120190319 | 29.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12190319 | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014067861 | Date: | 08.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2912034 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2912034 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/04, C07D413/06, C07D263/20, C07D263/32, A61K31/421, A61K31/422, A61P7/10, A61P9/10, A61P11/06, A61P13/12, A61P19/02, A61P29/00, A61P35/00 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
C07D263/20 (EP,CN,US);
C07D413/04 (EP,CN,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 3,4-DISUBSTITUIERTE OXAZOLIDINONDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS INHIBITOREN DES CALCIUM AKTIVIERTEN KALIUMKANALS | [2017/07] | English: | 3,4-DISUBSTITUTED OXAZOLIDINONE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS INHIBITORS OF THE CALCIUM ACTIVATED POTASSIUM CHANNEL | [2015/36] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'OXAZOLIDINONE 3,4-DISUBSTITUÉS ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'INBITEURS DU CANAL DE POTASSIUM ACTIVÉ PAR LE CALCIUM | [2017/07] |
Former [2015/36] | 3,4-DISUBSTITUIERTE OXAZOLIDINONDERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS INHIBITOREN DES CALCIUMAKTIVIERTEN KALIUMKANALKANALS | ||
Former [2015/36] | DÉRIVÉS D'OXAZOLIDINONE 3,4-DISUBSTITUÉE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME INHIBITEURS DES CANAUX POTASSIQUES ACTIVÉS PAR LE CALCIUM | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 06.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2013 | AL | 31.05.2017 | AT | 31.05.2017 | CY | 31.05.2017 | CZ | 31.05.2017 | DK | 31.05.2017 | EE | 31.05.2017 | ES | 31.05.2017 | FI | 31.05.2017 | HR | 31.05.2017 | IT | 31.05.2017 | LT | 31.05.2017 | LV | 31.05.2017 | MC | 31.05.2017 | MK | 31.05.2017 | NL | 31.05.2017 | PL | 31.05.2017 | PT | 31.05.2017 | RO | 31.05.2017 | RS | 31.05.2017 | SE | 31.05.2017 | SI | 31.05.2017 | SK | 31.05.2017 | SM | 31.05.2017 | TR | 31.05.2017 | BG | 31.08.2017 | NO | 31.08.2017 | GR | 01.09.2017 | IS | 30.09.2017 | IE | 25.10.2017 | LU | 25.10.2017 | MT | 25.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 25.10.2013 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 25.10.2013 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 25.10.2013 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 25.10.2013 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.10.2013 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 25.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | WO9731892 [ ] (SANKYO CO [JP], et al); | [A]WO0034248 (NEUROSEARCH AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [X]WO0242299 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,16 * page 14, line 8 - line 30 * * page 28 - page 29; examples 1j, 1m *; | [X]EP1254895 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-16 * page 79, line 46 - line 49 *; | [X]WO2007109098 (AZEVAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 35, lines 3-10 and the 2-oxo-imidazolidine compounds of the tables wherein R10 represents an alkyl or a phenyl * * page 36, the 2-oxo-imidazolidine compound of the second table wherein R10 represents a phenyl * * page 48 - page 49; examples 1, 2 *; | [X]WO2010123997 (ACHAOGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * pages 51-52; step 2 of example 5 *; | [X] - CHEMICAL CATALOG; SUPPLIER: aLPHACHIRON BIOCHEMICALS LTC, REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20120815), Database accession no. 1391422-81-3, XP002712595 [X] 1-7,9-16 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE: CHEMSPIDER (CHEMZOO, INC.), REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20080613), Database accession no. 1027988-84-6, XP002712596 [X] 1-10,16 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE: CHEMSPIDER (CHEMZOO, INC.), REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20080610), Database accession no. 1026897-75-5, XP002712597 [X] 1-12,16 * abstract * | [X] - MATSUI, SATOSHI ET AL, "Application of erythro-2-amino-1,2-diphenylethanol as a highly efficient chiral auxiliary. Highly stereoselective Staudinger-type .beta.-lactam synthesis using a 2-chloro-1-methylpyridinium salt as the dehydrating agent", SYNTHESI1S; CODEN: SYNTBF; ISSN: 0039-7881, (199808), no. 8, pages 1161 - 1166, XP002712598 [X] 1-16 * page 1162; scheme 3, the ethylacetate obtained by the N-alkylation of the compound 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1998-2117 | [X] - CHOPIN, NATHALIE ET AL, "Synthesis of the azetidinyl-thiazoline fragment of vioprolides A and C", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (2010), Database accession no. 2010:1115040, URL: STN, XP002712599 [X] 1-6,8-12,16 * the abstract; and, in particular, the compound with the Registry-Number: [1240490-38-3] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/157017810791514814 | [X] - MAGEE, DAVID I. ET AL, "Diastereoselective [4+3] cycloadditions of enantiopure nitrogen-stabilized oxyallyl cations", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY; CODEN: EJOCFK; ISSN: 1434-193X, (200608), no. 16, pages 3667 - 3680, XP002712600 [X] 1-16 * page 3668; scheme 2, compounds 1b and 3b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejoc.200600226 | [X] - DASTLIK K A ET AL, "An Expedient Route to the Glycine Templates (R)- or (S)-N-Cbz-5-Phenyl-1,4-oxazin-2-one", TETRAHEDRON ASYMMETRY, PERGAMON PRESS LTD, OXFORD, GB, (19960901), vol. 7, no. 9, doi:10.1016/0957-4166(96)00324-2, ISSN 0957-4166, pages 2525 - 2526, XP004048323 [X] 1-16 * page 2526; compound 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0957-4166(96)00324-2 | [X] - SHIBATA, TOMOYUKI ET AL, "Preparation and formulation of hydroxamic acid derivatives as matrix metalloproteinase inhibitors", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1997), Database accession no. 1997:594709, URL: STN, XP002712601 [X] 1-7,9-12,16 * the abstract; and, in particular, the compound with the Registry-Number: [195510-34-0] * | [X] - KADUSHKIN, A. V. ET AL, "Synthesis and neurotropic properties of oxazolidone analogs of piracetam", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1995), Database accession no. 1995:945500, URL: STN, XP002712602 [X] 1-12,16 * the abstract; and, in particular, the compound with the Registry-Number: [172514-87-3] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02226388 | [X] - LE COZ, SYLVIE ET AL, "Conjugate addition of organocuprates to methyl crotonate linked to chiral oxazolidones", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1993), Database accession no. 1993:408719, URL: STN, XP002712603 [X] 1-16 * the abstract; and, in particular, the compounds with the Registry-Numbers [96727-96-7] and [148028-20-0] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00397919308009764 | [X] - TAKAHASHI, HIROSHI ET AL, "Stereoselective reduction of (S)-4-isopropyl-3-phenacyl-1,3-oxazolidin-2- one by means of 1,4-asymmetric induction: synthesis of chiral 2-amino-1-phenylethanols", CHEMICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, CODEN: CPBTAL; ISSN: 0009-2363, (1985), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 84 - 89, XP002712604 [X] 1-12,16 * page 86; compounds 6, 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1248/cpb.33.84 | by applicant | US2010056637 | - H. WULFF, EXPERT REV. CLIN. PHARMACOL., (2010), vol. 3, page 385 | - M. ALBAQUMI ET AL., KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, (2008), vol. 74, page 740 | - I. CHUNG ET AL., J. NEUROIMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 122, page 40 | - T. SCHILLING ET AL., EUR.J. NEUROSCI., (2004), vol. 19, page 1496 | - D. THARP ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL. HEART CIRC. PHYSIOL., (2006), vol. 291, page H2493 | - G. CRUSE ET AL., THORAX, (2006), vol. 61, page 880 | - J. WOJTULEWSKI ET AL., ANN. RHEUM. DIS., (1980), vol. 39, page 469 | - F. MAULER ET AL., EUR. J. NEUROSCI., (2004), vol. 20, page 1761 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2010), vol. 107, page 1541 | - I. GRGIC, TRANSPLANT. PROC., (2009), vol. 41, page 2601 | - R. KOHLER ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2003), vol. 108, page 1119 | - D. THARP, THROMB. VASC. BIOL., (2008), vol. 28, page 1084 | - K. TOYAMA ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2008), vol. 118, page 3025 | - I. GRGIC, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2009), vol. 106, page 14518 | - C. CHOU ET AL., EXPERT. REV. MOL. DIAGN., (2008), vol. 8, page 179 | - L. BENZAQUEN, NAT. MED., (1995), vol. 1, page 534 | - Z. WAN ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2007), vol. 26, page 5107 | - J. ORGANOMETALLIC CHEM., (2000), page 220 |