EP2844410 - METAL POWDER CASTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2015/11] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIRONETS, Sergey 14 Elmore Road Norfolk, Connecticut 06058 / US | 02 /
TWELVES, Wendell V. 218 Conestoga Way Glastonbury, Connecticut 06033 / US | 03 /
KLUCHA, Agnes 300 West Road Colchester, Connecticut 06415 / US | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/26] |
Former [2015/11] | Hull, James Edward Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13784346.2 | 01.05.2013 | [2022/26] | WO2013US38999 | Priority number, date | US201213461280 | 01.05.2012 Original published format: US201213461280 | [2015/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013166103 | Date: | 07.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2844410 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2844410 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B22D23/06, B22D27/04, B22D19/16, B22C9/06, B22C9/22 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
B22D27/04 (EP,US);
B22C9/065 (EP,US);
B22C9/22 (EP,US);
B22D23/06 (EP,US);
B22D25/02 (EP,US);
F01D25/30 (US);
F04D29/522 (US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2230/21 (EP,US);
F05D2230/22 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/17] | B22D23/06, B22D27/04, B22D19/16 | ||
Former IPC [2015/11] | B22D17/00, B22D17/02, B22D17/20, B22F3/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLPULVERGUSS | [2015/11] | English: | METAL POWDER CASTING | [2015/11] | French: | MOULAGE DE POUDRE MÉTALLIQUE | [2015/11] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 19.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.06.2022 | AT | 29.06.2022 | CZ | 29.06.2022 | DK | 29.06.2022 | EE | 29.06.2022 | ES | 29.06.2022 | FI | 29.06.2022 | HR | 29.06.2022 | IT | 29.06.2022 | LT | 29.06.2022 | LV | 29.06.2022 | MC | 29.06.2022 | NL | 29.06.2022 | PL | 29.06.2022 | RO | 29.06.2022 | RS | 29.06.2022 | SE | 29.06.2022 | SI | 29.06.2022 | SK | 29.06.2022 | SM | 29.06.2022 | BG | 29.09.2022 | NO | 29.09.2022 | GR | 30.09.2022 | IS | 29.10.2022 | PT | 31.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS4944936 (NIPPON TOKUSHU GIJ) [X] 1-4,6,8,9,11-15 * abstract * [I] 5,7; | [X]EP0072175 (MOWILL JAN) [X] 1,3,5,7,11,12,14,15 * page 5, lines 9-16 * * page 6, lines 15-21; figures 1-7 *; | [XI]JPS59218256 (NIPPON DIA CLEVITE CO) [X] 1-4,8,9,12-15 * abstract * [I] 5; | [X]JPH0299261 (ONODA HAJIME) [X] 12-14* abstract * | International search | [X]JPS58181465 (OKADA KATSUZOU, et al); | [Y]US6321885 (WENDT FLORIAN [DE]); | [Y]JP2007180373 (INTER METALLICS KK); | [Y]KR100861287B (KOREA IND TECH INST [KR], et al); | [Y]KR20100134346 (KOREA IND TECH INST [KR]) | Examination | JPH067916 |