EP2845862 - METHOD FOR INCUBATING PLURIPOTENT STEM CELLS AND POLYPEPTIDE TO BE USED THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Yuta c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
IWATA, Rie c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 03 /
IWAKI, Yoshihide c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 04 /
SASAKI, Tasuku c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/11] | Application number, filing date | 13784603.6 | 24.04.2013 | [2018/47] | WO2013JP62122 | Priority number, date | JP20120104816 | 01.05.2012 Original published format: JP 2012104816 | [2015/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013164970 | Date: | 07.11.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2845862 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2845862 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00, C07K14/00, C07K14/47, C12N5/074, C07K14/78 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
C12N5/0696 (EP,CN,US);
C07K14/78 (EP,CN,US);
C12N5/0068 (US);
C07K14/001 (US);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C12N5/0607 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/47] | C07K14/00, C12M1/00, C12N5/073, C12N5/0735, C12N5/074, C12N5/10, C07K14/78, C07K14/47 | ||
Former IPC [2015/11] | C07K14/00, C12M1/00, C12N5/073, C12N5/0735, C12N5/074, C12N5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INKUBATION PLURIPOTENTER STAMMZELLEN UND POLYPEPTIDE ZUR VERWENDUNG DAFÜR | [2015/11] | English: | METHOD FOR INCUBATING PLURIPOTENT STEM CELLS AND POLYPEPTIDE TO BE USED THEREFOR | [2015/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INCUBATION DE CELLULES SOUCHES PLURIPOTENTES ET POLYPEPTIDE À UTILISER À CET EFFET | [2015/11] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2014 | Translation filed | 31.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 12.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2013 | AL | 21.11.2018 | AT | 21.11.2018 | CY | 21.11.2018 | CZ | 21.11.2018 | DK | 21.11.2018 | EE | 21.11.2018 | ES | 21.11.2018 | FI | 21.11.2018 | HR | 21.11.2018 | IT | 21.11.2018 | LT | 21.11.2018 | LV | 21.11.2018 | MC | 21.11.2018 | MK | 21.11.2018 | MT | 21.11.2018 | NL | 21.11.2018 | PL | 21.11.2018 | RO | 21.11.2018 | RS | 21.11.2018 | SE | 21.11.2018 | SI | 21.11.2018 | SK | 21.11.2018 | SM | 21.11.2018 | TR | 21.11.2018 | BG | 21.02.2019 | NO | 21.02.2019 | GR | 22.02.2019 | IS | 21.03.2019 | PT | 21.03.2019 | IE | 24.04.2019 | LU | 24.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 24.04.2013 | |
AL | 21.11.2018 | ||
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
MT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.04.2013 | |
AL | 21.11.2018 | ||
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 21.11.2018 | |
NO | 21.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2012032169 (UNIV BRISTOL [GB], et al) [Y] 1-19 * figure 4; claims 7-8 *; | [X] - JOSEPH R KLIM ET AL, "A defined glycosaminoglycan-binding substratum for human pluripotent stem cells", NATURE METHODS, (20101201), vol. 7, no. 12, doi:10.1038/nmeth.1532, ISSN 1548-7091, pages 989 - 994, XP055061190 [X] 1-19 * page 992, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1532 | [X] - GUOKAI CHEN ET AL, "Chemically defined conditions for human iPSC derivation and culture", NATURE METHODS, (20110501), vol. 8, no. 5, doi:10.1038/nmeth.1593, ISSN 1548-7091, pages 424 - 429, XP055092759 [X] 1-19 * page 425, column 2, paragraph 2; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1593 | [Y] - PROWSE A B J ET AL, "Long term culture of human embryonic stem cells on recombinant vitronectin in ascorbate free media", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 31, no. 32, ISSN 0142-9612, (20101101), pages 8281 - 8288, (20100802), XP027259533 [Y] 1-19 * table 1 * | [Y] - KERRY J. MANTON ET AL, "A Chimeric Vitronectin: IGF-I Protein Supports Feeder-Cell-Free and Serum-Free Culture of Human Embryonic Stem Cells", STEM CELLS AND DEVELOPMENT, (20100901), vol. 19, no. 9, doi:10.1089/scd.2009.0504, ISSN 1547-3287, pages 1297 - 1305, XP055010532 [Y] 1-19 * page 292, column 2; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/scd.2009.0504 | [Y] - CHANDRAMOULI R CHILLAKURI ET AL, "Heparin binding domain in vitronectin is required for oligomerization and thus enhances integrin mediated cell adhesion and spreading", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 584, no. 15, doi:10.1016/J.FEBSLET.2010.06.023, ISSN 0014-5793, (20100614), pages 3287 - 3291, (20100619), XP028340487 [Y] 1-19 * page 3290, column 1; figure 1a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2010.06.023 | [Y] - SCHLEICHER IRIS ET AL, "SURFACE MODIFICATION BY COMPLEXES OF VITRONECTIN AND GROWTH FACTORS FOR SERUM-FREE CULTURE OF HUMAN OSTEOBLASTS", TISSUE ENGINEERING, LARCHMONT, NY, US, (20051101), vol. 11, no. 11-12, doi:10.1089/TEN.2005.11.1688, ISSN 1076-3279, pages 1688 - 1698, XP009072079 [Y] 1-19 * page 1690 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ten.2005.11.1688 | International search | [A]JP2010537626 (QUEENSLAND UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY); | [X] - CHEN GUOKAI ET AL., "Chemically defined conditions for human iPSC derivation and culture", NATURE METHODS, (2011), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 424 - 429, XP055092759 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1593 | [X] - PROWSE B.J. ANDREW ET AL., "Long term culture of human embryonic stem cells on recombinant vitronectin in ascorbate free media", BIOMATERIALS, (2010), vol. 31, pages 8281 - 8288, XP027259533 | [A] - MELKOUMIAN ZARA ET AL., "Synthetic peptide- acrylate surfaces for long-term self-renewal and cardiomyocyte differentiation of human embryonic stem cells", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 28, no. 6, pages 606 - 612, XP002636474 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT.1629 | [A] - KLIM R. JOSEPH ET AL., "A defined glycosaminoglycan-binding substratum for human pluripotent stem cells", NATURE METHODS, (2010), vol. 7, no. 12, pages 989 - 994, XP055061190 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1532 | by applicant | JP2001017183 | JP2010029186 | JP2012502664 | JP2012104816 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 19, pages 971 - 974 | - BIOMATERIALS, (201011), vol. 31, no. 32, pages 8281 - 8218 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 28, no. 6, pages 606 - 610 | - KYTE J.; DOOLITTLE R. F., J. MOL. BIOL, (1982), vol. 157, pages 105 - 132 | - NATURE, (20070719), vol. 448, pages 313 - 317 | - CELL, (20060825), vol. 126, no. 4, pages 663 - 676 |