EP2844224 - DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR TREATING OPEN ANGLE GLAUCOMA AND OCULAR HYPERTENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/11] | DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHODS OF TREATING OPEN ANGLE GLAUCOMA AND OCULAR HYPERTENSION | ||
[2017/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mati Therapeutics Inc. 4317 Dunning Lane Austin, TX 78746 / US | For all designated states Utkhede, Deepank 18263 68th Avenue Surrey, BC V3S 9C6 / CA | For all designated states Cadden, Suzanne 1800 Rogers Road No 301 Fort Worth TX 76107 / US | For all designated states Hao, Yong 6820 Fleming Street Vancouver, BC V5P 3H5 / CA | [2017/40] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states Mati Therapeutics Inc. 4317 Dunning Lane Austin, TX 78746 / US | ||
For all designated states Utkhede, Deepank 18263 68th Avenue Surrey, BC V3S 9C6 / CA | |||
For all designated states Cadden, Suzanne 5829 Grousewoods Crescent North Vancover, BC V7R 4V3 / CA | |||
For all designated states Hao, Yong 6820 Fleming Street Vancouver, BC V5P 3H5 / CA | |||
Former [2015/11] | For all designated states QLT Inc. 887 Great Northern Way Suite 101 Vancouver, BC V5T 4T5 / CA | ||
For all designated states Utkhede, Deepank 18263 68th Avenue Surrey, BC V3S 9C6 / CA | |||
For all designated states Cadden, Suzanne 5829 Grousewoods Crescent North Vancover, BC V7R 4V3 / CA | |||
For all designated states Hao, Yong 6820 Fleming Street Vancouver, BC V5P 3H5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UTKHEDE, Deepank 18263 68th Avenue Surrey, BC V3S 9C6 / CA | 02 /
CADDEN, Suzanne 1800 Rogers Road No. 301 Fort Worth, TX 76107 / CA | 03 /
HAO, Yong 6820 Fleming Street Vancouver, BC V5P 3H5 / CA | [2015/43] |
Former [2015/36] | 01 /
UTKHEDE, Deepank 18263 68th Avenue Surrey, BC V3S 9C6 / CA | ||
02 /
CADDEN, Suzanne 1800 Rogers Road No.: 301 Fort Worth, TX 76107 / CA | |||
03 /
HAO, Yong 6820 Fleming Street Vancouver, BC V5P 3H5 / CA | |||
Former [2015/11] | 01 /
UTKHEDE, Deepank 18263 68th Avenue Surrey, BC V3S 9C6 / CA | ||
02 /
CADDEN, Suzanne 5829 Grousewoods Crescent North Vancover, BC V7R 4V3 / CA | |||
03 /
HAO, Yong 6820 Fleming Street Vancouver, BC V5P 3H5 / CA | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2015/11] | HGF Limited Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13784720.8 | 27.02.2013 | [2018/15] | WO2013IB00694 | Priority number, date | US201261642287P | 03.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261642287 P | US201261644401P | 08.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261644401 P | US201261644397P | 08.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261644397 P | US201261659921P | 14.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261659921 P | US201261680641P | 07.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261680641 P | US201261717615P | 23.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261717615 P | [2015/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013164671 | Date: | 07.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2844224 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2844224 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 07.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61F2/02, A61K31/5575, A61L31/06, A61L31/16, A61M31/00, A61F9/00 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
A61F9/00781 (EP);
A61K31/5575 (EP);
A61K9/0051 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61K9/7007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/11] | A61K9/00, A61F9/00, A61K31/5575, A61L31/04, A61L31/16, A61P27/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNGSSYSTEM FÜR BEHANDLUNG VON OFFENWINKELGLAUKOM UND OKULARER HYPERTONIE | [2017/09] | English: | DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR TREATING OPEN ANGLE GLAUCOMA AND OCULAR HYPERTENSION | [2017/09] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN GLAUCOME À ANGLE OUVERT ET DE L'HYPERTENSION OCULAIRE | [2017/09] |
Former [2015/11] | WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OFFENWINKELGLAUKOM UND OKULARER HYPERTONIE | ||
Former [2015/11] | DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHODS OF TREATING OPEN ANGLE GLAUCOMA AND OCULAR HYPERTENSION | ||
Former [2015/11] | SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT D'UN GLAUCOME À ANGLE OUVERT ET DE L'HYPERTENSION OCULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 06.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 19.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | 03   M02   Fee paid on   27.03.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2013 | AL | 11.04.2018 | AT | 11.04.2018 | CY | 11.04.2018 | CZ | 11.04.2018 | DK | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | ES | 11.04.2018 | FI | 11.04.2018 | HR | 11.04.2018 | IT | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MC | 11.04.2018 | MK | 11.04.2018 | NL | 11.04.2018 | PL | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | RS | 11.04.2018 | SE | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | SM | 11.04.2018 | TR | 11.04.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | NO | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | PT | 13.08.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.02.2013 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IS | 11.08.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IS | 11.08.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 11.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005232972 (ODRICH STEVEN [US]) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0014] , [0 18]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2008083118 (QLT PLUG DELIVERY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0112] - [0114]; figure 9 *; | [IY]WO2010085696 (QLT PLUG DELIVERY INC [US], et al) [I] 1-4,9-14 * page 91, line 5 - line 18 * * page 96, line 8 - line 30 * [Y] 5-8; | [Y]WO2010096822 (QLT PLUG DELIVERY INC [US], et al) [Y] 5-8 * paragraphs [0113] , [ 116]; figures 10A, 10B * | International search | [X]WO2010085696 (QLT PLUG DELIVERY INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US4281654 | US4952581 | US5296504 | US5811443 | US2002055701 | US2004170685 | US2005048121 | US2005129731 | WO2006014434 | WO2007115261 | WO2007115259 | US2008181930 | US2009099626 | US2009104248 | US2009105749 | US2009104243 | US2009280158 | WO2010085696 | US2010209477 | US2010274204 | US7910767 | WO2011066479 | - BITO, L. Z., Biological Protection with Prostaglandins, CRC PRESS INC, (1985), pages 231 - 252 | - BITO, L. Z., Applied Pharmacology in the Medical Treatment of Glaucomas Drance, GRUNE & STRATTON, (1984), pages 477 - 505 | - WINFIELD AJ ET AL., "A study of the causes of non-compliance by patients prescribed eyedrops.", BR J OPHTHALMOL., (199008), vol. 74, no. 8, pages 477 - 80 | - NORELL SE; GRANSTROM PA., "Self-medication with pilocarpine among outpatients in a glaucoma clinic", BR J OPHTHALMOL., (198002), vol. 64, no. 2, pages 137 - 41 | - ZIAI ET AL., "The effects on aqueous dynamics of PhXA41, a new prostaglandin F2 a analogue, after topical application in normal and ocular hypertensive human eyes", ARCH OPHTHALMOL., (1993), vol. 111, pages 1351 - 1358, XP000973095 | - REALINI ET AL., "The uniocular drug trial and second-eye response to glaucoma medications", OPHTHALMOL, (2004), vol. 111, pages 421 - 426 | - LINDEN; AIM, "the effect on intraocular pressure of latanoprost once or four times daily", BR. J. OPHTHALMOL, (2001), vol. 85, pages 1163 - 1166 | US20080066223 | US20090521543 | US20040825047 | US20060571147 | US20060871867 | US20070695537 | US20070695545 | US20070970696 | US20070970699 | US20070970709 | US20070970720 | US20070970755 | US20070970820 | US20070974367 | US20080033211 | US20080036816 | US20080049347 | US20080049360 | US20080052595 | US20080075309 | US20080283002 | US20080231986 | US20080231987 | US20080231989 | US20080332219 | US20090378710 | US20090154693 | US20090209036 | US20090209630 | US20090432553 | US20090463279 | US20090490923 | US20090499605 | US20090271862 | US20090252057 | US20090604202 | US20090643502 | US20100692452 | US20100710855 |