EP2890554 - A METHOD FOR REALISING CARTONS FOR PACKING AND AN APPARATUS ACTUATING THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.L. Auto S.r.l. Via della Croce, 87 00187 Roma (RM) / IT | [2016/13] |
Former [2015/28] | For all designated states F.L. Auto S.r.l. Via della Giuliana 63 00195 Roma (RM) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PONTI, Giuseppe Via Copernico 38 I-06011 Cerbara - Citta' di Castello (Perugia) / IT | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | Dall'Olio, Christian, et al INVENTION S.r.l. Via delle Armi, 1 40137 Bologna / IT | [2015/28] | Application number, filing date | 13785631.6 | 28.08.2013 | [2016/13] | WO2013IB58048 | Priority number, date | IT2012BO00463 | 31.08.2012 Original published format: IT BO20120463 | [2015/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014033635 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2890554 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2890554 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B31B1/22, B31B1/25, B31B1/16, B31B1/62, B31B3/00, B65D5/20, B65D75/14, B65B57/12, B65B11/00 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
B31B50/16 (EP,BR,US);
B65B11/004 (EP,BR,US);
B65B57/12 (EP,BR,US);
B65B59/001 (EP);
B65D5/2095 (EP,BR,US);
B31B2100/00 (EP,US);
B31B2100/0026 (EP,US);
B31B2110/35 (EP,US);
B31B2120/004 (EP,US);
B31B2120/102 (EP,US);
B31B2120/502 (EP,US);
B31B50/22 (EP,US);
B31B50/256 (EP,US);
B31B50/622 (EP,US);
B31B50/81 (EP,US);
B65B2210/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/28] | B31B1/22, B31B1/25, B31B1/16, B31B1/62, B31B3/00, B65D5/20, B65D75/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KARTONS ZUM VERPACKEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2015/28] | English: | A METHOD FOR REALISING CARTONS FOR PACKING AND AN APPARATUS ACTUATING THE METHOD | [2015/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CARTONS D'EMBALLAGE ET APPAREIL METTANT EN OEUVRE LEDIT PROCÉDÉ | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 30.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2013 | AL | 30.03.2016 | AT | 30.03.2016 | BG | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | CZ | 30.03.2016 | DK | 30.03.2016 | EE | 30.03.2016 | FI | 30.03.2016 | HR | 30.03.2016 | LT | 30.03.2016 | LV | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | MK | 30.03.2016 | RO | 30.03.2016 | RS | 30.03.2016 | SE | 30.03.2016 | SI | 30.03.2016 | SK | 30.03.2016 | SM | 30.03.2016 | NO | 30.06.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | IS | 30.07.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BG | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2395352 (STAUDE EDWIN G, et al) [A] 1-15* page 3, line 69 - page 4, line 5; figure 9 *; | [A]GB1083889 (RITE SIZE CORRUGATED MACHINERY) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 13 - line 79; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2411700 (AGRAFOR [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 10; figures 1-4 * |