EP2931031 - METHOD FOR TREATING AGRICULTURAL LAND WITH GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lucební Závody Draslovka A.S. Kolín Havlíckova 605 280 99 Kolín IV / CZ | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIS, Volker Prof.-Stock-Strasse 4 85276 Pfaffenhofen a.d.Ilm / DE | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Kratochvil, Vaclav Patent and Trademark Office P.O. Box 26 295 01 Mnichovo Hradiste / CZ | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 13786169.6 | 31.10.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013EP03288 | Priority number, date | DE20121024180 | 11.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012024180 | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014090357 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2931031 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2931031 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01M13/00, A01M17/00, A01G25/06, A01N59/24, A01M1/24 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
A01M17/002 (EP,US);
A01M13/00 (RU);
A01G25/00 (EP,US);
A01N25/02 (US);
A01N59/24 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/24, A01N25/00, A01N25/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON LANDBÖDEN MIT GAS | [2015/43] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING AGRICULTURAL LAND WITH GAS | [2015/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE TRAITER UNE TERRE AGRICOLE AU GAZ | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 10.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 31.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 31.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Request for further processing for: | 06.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2013 | AL | 14.12.2016 | AT | 14.12.2016 | BE | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | RS | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 31.10.2013 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 31.10.2013 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 31.10.2013 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB178409 (JAMES WRIGHT VAN METER) [A] 1,9 * page 1, line 43 - page 2, line 75; figure - *; | [A]GB258324 (GUY HODGENS BUCHANAN) [A] 1 * page 1, line 14 - line 38; claims 1,6,10 *; | [A]WO0005945 (ALCE GARDEN SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1,9 * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 26; figures 3-8 *; | [A]US6698367 (DECOUZON DANIEL L [FR]) [A] 1,9 * column 4, line 14 - column 6, line 2; figure - *; | [A]WO2005037332 (BOC LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 32 - page 2, line 9 * * page 3, line 3 - line 5; claims 7,8,17,20 *; | [A]US2009087467 (RODRIGUEZ-KABANA RODRIGO [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0029]; claims 1,24,25 *; | [A]EP2184261 (LONZA AG [CH]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002]; figures 1,6,7 *; | [A]US2011239918 (RAPOPORT URI [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017]; figure 1; claim 1 * |