EP2847295 - LIGHT EMITTING MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radovanovic, Pavle 139 Brighton Street Unit 13B Waterloo, Ontario N2J 4Z5 / CA | For all designated states Wang, Ting 268 Phillip Street Ca-14-4 WCRI Waterloo, Ontario N2L 6G9 / CA | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2015/12] | Application number, filing date | 13787171.1 | 07.05.2013 | WO2013CA50353 | Priority number, date | US201261643736P | 07.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261643736 P | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013166601 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2847295 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 14.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/50, C09K11/06, C09K11/54, C09K11/62, C09K11/64 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
C09K11/54 (EP,US);
C09K11/621 (EP,US);
C09K11/641 (EP,US);
H01L33/504 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1018 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/12] | C09K11/08, H01L33/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDES MATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2015/12] | English: | LIGHT EMITTING MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2015/12] | French: | MATÉRIAU ÉMETTEUR DE LUMIÈRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2015/12] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 30.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/31] | 28.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2010123809 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,12,13,15 * page 8, line 27 - page 23, line 12; figures 1-8 * [Y] 5,6,10,11,14 [I] 8,9; | [XAI]WO2010123814 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,12,13,15 * page 4, line 29 - page 21, line 32; figures 1-6 * [A] 5,6,10,11,14 [I] 8,9; | [YA]WO2007078297 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG], et al) [Y] 5,6,10,11,14 * page 3, line 18 - page 22, line 20; figures 1-10 * [A] 1-4,7-9,12,13,15; | [A]DE102007049005 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2010084629 (PARK KYOUNG SOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2005253152 (KLIMOV VICTOR I [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2008007156 (GIBSON GARY A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0085]; figures 1-10B * | International search | [X]US8309375 (SHIMIZU YOSHINORI [JP], et al); | [X]US3510732 (AMANS ROBERT L); | [X]US5966393 (HIDE FUMITOMO [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2010123809 | WO2010123814 |