EP2846871 - IMPROVED THERMAL STIMULATION PROBE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medoc Ltd. 1 Hadekel St. 30095 Ramat Yishai / IL | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN-ASHER, Hanan 3 Marc Chagall St. 3297003 Haifa / IL | 02 /
HAIMAN, Amir 1 Hagoren St. 3707615 Karkur / IL | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Denninger Str. 169 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstraße 14 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13787454.1 | 09.05.2013 | WO2013IL50405 | Priority number, date | US201261644446P | 09.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261644446 P | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013168168 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2846871 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, A61F7/00 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
A61F7/007 (EP,US);
A61F7/08 (KR);
A61B18/04 (KR);
A61M37/00 (KR);
A61N1/36 (KR);
A61N1/36021 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0075 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0086 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0093 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0095 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0096 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0228 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/12] | A61N1/36, A61M37/00, A61F7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE SONDE ZUR THERMISCHEN STIMULATION UND VERFAHREN | [2015/12] | English: | IMPROVED THERMAL STIMULATION PROBE AND METHOD | [2015/12] | French: | SONDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE STIMULATION THERMIQUE PERFECTIONNÉS | [2015/12] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 01.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 15.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH1187962 (NEC GUMMA LTD) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US6301111 (KATSUI TADASHI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 45 - line 63; figure 9 *; | [A]US2007010860 (GAFNI EHUD [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0069]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2008046047 (JACOBS DANIEL [US]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0040] , [0051]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2010129993 (UNIV QUEENSLAND [AU], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 9, line 5 - line 22; figures 4,7 * * page 12, line 3 - line 29 * * page 14, line 24 - page 15, line 16 * | International search | [Y]US6301111 (KATSUI TADASHI [JP]); | [Y]US2002103520 (LATHAM JEFFREY WADE [US]); | [Y]US2005075669 (KING GARY W [US]); | [X]US2007010860 (GAFNI EHUD [IL], et al); | [Y]US2008097557 (EGGERS PHILIP E [US], et al); | [Y]US2009018626 (LEVINSON MITCHELL E [US], et al); | [Y]WO2010129993 (UNIV QUEENSLAND [AU], et al) |