EP2848094 - LIGHT CONTROL SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chen, Chia Ming Apt. 307 14 Concord Avenue Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/12] | Application number, filing date | 13787647.0 | 06.05.2013 | [2020/04] | WO2013US39666 | Priority number, date | US201261643535P | 07.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261643535 P | US201261684336P | 17.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261684336 P | US201261696518P | 04.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261696518 P | US201361760966P | 05.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361760966 P | US201313826177 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US201313826177 | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013169635 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2848094 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2848094 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, F21V14/00, G06K9/00, G06F3/01, H04B10/116, // H05B33/08 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
F21V14/06 (EP,CN,US);
A63F13/213 (US);
A63F13/428 (US);
F21V14/02 (EP,CN,US);
F21V14/04 (EP,CN,US);
F21V23/0471 (EP,CN,US);
F21V5/02 (EP,CN,US);
F21V5/04 (EP,CN,US);
G02B6/0096 (US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06V40/28 (EP,US);
H04B10/116 (US);
H04N23/11 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/56 (EP,US);
H05B45/10 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/28] | H05B37/02, F21V14/00, G06K9/00, // H05B33/08 | ||
Former IPC [2015/12] | H05B37/02, F21V14/00, G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | [2015/12] | English: | LIGHT CONTROL SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2015/12] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMANDE DE LUMIÈRE | [2015/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 13.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 11.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2019 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2013 | AL | 22.01.2020 | AT | 22.01.2020 | CY | 22.01.2020 | CZ | 22.01.2020 | DK | 22.01.2020 | EE | 22.01.2020 | ES | 22.01.2020 | FI | 22.01.2020 | HR | 22.01.2020 | IT | 22.01.2020 | LT | 22.01.2020 | LV | 22.01.2020 | MC | 22.01.2020 | MK | 22.01.2020 | MT | 22.01.2020 | NL | 22.01.2020 | PL | 22.01.2020 | RO | 22.01.2020 | RS | 22.01.2020 | SE | 22.01.2020 | SI | 22.01.2020 | SK | 22.01.2020 | SM | 22.01.2020 | TR | 22.01.2020 | BG | 22.04.2020 | NO | 22.04.2020 | GR | 23.04.2020 | GB | 06.05.2020 | IE | 06.05.2020 | LU | 06.05.2020 | IS | 22.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | FR | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | PT | 14.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 06.05.2013 | |
AL | 22.01.2020 | ||
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
GB | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 06.05.2013 | |
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
GB | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
GB | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
GB | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
GB | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IE | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
LU | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 22.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004303685 (CREST KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US2006044800 (REIME GERD [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0034] - [0052]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]GB2421074 (MATHMOS LTD [GB]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US2008215391 (DOWLING KEVIN J [US], et al) [A] 15 * paragraphs [0089] - [0109]; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US2008292320 (PEDERSON JOHN C [US]) [A] 15 * abstract *; | [A]US2009042695 (CHIEN SHIH YING [TW], et al) [A] 15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0045]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2009278915 (KRAMER KWINDLA HULTMAN [US], et al) [A] 151 * abstract *; | [X]US2010277074 (VAN ENDERT TONY PETRUS [TW], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0060] - [0074]; figures 1-24G * * paragraphs [0131] - [0136] *; | [A]US2010309370 (UESHIMA HIROMU [JP], et al) [A] 15 * abstract *; | [X]WO2010146446 (GIRLANDO DAVIDE [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * pages 4-11; figures 1-8 * * pages 15-17 *; | [E]WO2013085600 (GREENWAVE REALITY PTE LTD [SG], et al) [E] 1 * page 12; figures 1A-6 * | International search | [A]KR19980080509 ; | [A]KR20040037219 ; | [Y]JP2009153583 (SAIUI GROUP LTD); | [X]JP2011037386 (KOITO KOGYO KK); | [A]JP2012043722 (ROHM CO LTD) | by applicant | US2006044800 | US2010277074 | WO2010146446 |