EP2847230 - HETEROMULTIMER CONSTRUCTS OF IMMUNOGLOBULIN HEAVY CHAINS WITH MUTATIONS IN THE FC DOMAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zymeworks Inc. 540-1385 West 8th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6H 3V9 / CA | [2020/33] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Zymeworks Inc. 540-1385 West 8th Avenue Vancouver, British Colombia V6H 3V9 / CA | ||
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Zymeworks, Inc. 540-1385 West 8th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6H 3V9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPRETER VON KREUDENSTEIN, Thomas 540-1385 West 8th Avenue Vancouver British Columbia V6H 9V9 / CA | 02 /
ESCOBAR-CABRERA, Eric 540-1385 West 8th Avenue Burnaby British Columbia V6H 9V9 / CA | 03 /
NG, Gordon YiuKon 6531 Yew Street Vancouver British Columbia V6P 2N8 / CA | 04 /
DIXIT, Surjit Bhimarao 540-1385 West 8th Avenue Vancouver British Columbia V6H 9V9 / CA | 05 /
LARIO, Paula Irene 201 - 2080 East Kent Avenue South Vancouver British Columbia V5X 2Y2 / CA | 06 /
POON, David Kai Yuen 540-1385 West 8th Avenue Vancouver British Columbia V6H 9V9 / CA | [2020/33] |
Former [2015/12] | 01 /
SPRETER VON KREUDENSTEIN, Thomas 1007-1330 Harwood Street Vancouver British Columbia V6E 1S8 / CA | ||
02 /
ESCOBAR-CABRERA, Eric 8562 Woodridge Place Burnaby British Columbia V5A 4B3 / CA | |||
03 /
NG, Gordon YiuKon 1535 West 64th Avenue Vancouver British Columbia V6P 2N8 / CA | |||
04 /
DIXIT, Surjit Bhimarao 11651 Kingfisher Drive, 51 Richmond British Columbia V7E 3N5 / CA | |||
05 /
LARIO, Paula Irene 201 - 2080 East Kent Avenue South Vancouver British Columbia V5X 2Y2 / CA | |||
06 /
POON, David Kai Yuen 9230 Railway Avenue Richmond British Columbia V7E 2B6 / CA | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2020/33] |
Former [2015/12] | Wichmann, Hendrik Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13788302.1 | 10.05.2013 | [2020/33] | WO2013CA00471 | Priority number, date | US201261645555P | 10.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261645555 P | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013166594 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2847230 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2847230 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 14.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/46, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61P37/02, C07K16/12, C07K16/24, C07K16/28, C07K16/30 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
C07K16/32 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/283 (US);
C07K16/2863 (EP,US);
C07K16/468 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/526 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HETEROMULTIMERKONSTRUKTE AUS SCHWEREN IMMUNOGLOBULINKETTEN MIT MUTATIONEN IN DER FC-DOMÄNE | [2015/12] | English: | HETEROMULTIMER CONSTRUCTS OF IMMUNOGLOBULIN HEAVY CHAINS WITH MUTATIONS IN THE FC DOMAIN | [2015/12] | French: | CONSTRUCTIONS HÉTÉROMULTIMÈRES DE CHAÎNES LOURDES D'IMMUNOGLOBULINES COMPRENANT DES MUTATIONS DANS LE DOMAINE FC | [2015/12] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 13.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.05.2013 | AL | 12.08.2020 | AT | 12.08.2020 | CY | 12.08.2020 | CZ | 12.08.2020 | DK | 12.08.2020 | EE | 12.08.2020 | FI | 12.08.2020 | HR | 12.08.2020 | LT | 12.08.2020 | LV | 12.08.2020 | MC | 12.08.2020 | MK | 12.08.2020 | MT | 12.08.2020 | NL | 12.08.2020 | PL | 12.08.2020 | RO | 12.08.2020 | RS | 12.08.2020 | SE | 12.08.2020 | SI | 12.08.2020 | SK | 12.08.2020 | SM | 12.08.2020 | TR | 12.08.2020 | BG | 12.11.2020 | NO | 12.11.2020 | GR | 13.11.2020 | IS | 12.12.2020 | PT | 14.12.2020 | IE | 10.05.2021 | LU | 10.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 10.05.2013 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
MK | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
TR | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 10.05.2021 | ||
LU | 10.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 10.05.2013 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
MK | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 10.05.2021 | ||
LU | 10.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 10.05.2013 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 10.05.2021 | ||
LU | 10.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 10.05.2013 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 10.05.2021 | ||
LU | 10.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 10.05.2021 | ||
LU | 10.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
IE | 10.05.2021 | ||
LU | 10.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
LU | 10.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 12.08.2020 | |
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | DK | 12.08.2020 | |
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2011008345 (ASHMAN CLAIRE [GB], et al) [I] 1-20 * table 40 * * table 37 * [Y] 8; | [Y]WO2011063348 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [Y] 8 * page 17; table 2 *; | [E]WO2013063702 (ZYMEWORKS INC [CA]) [E] 1 * page 2 *; | [A] - DEMAREST S J ET AL, "Optimization of the Antibody CH3 Domain by Residue Frequency Analysis of IgG Sequences", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, UNITED KINGDOM, (20040102), vol. 335, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JMB.2003.10.040, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 41 - 48, XP004476444 [A] 1-20 * figure 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2003.10.040 | [A] - ALTINTAS ISIL ET AL, "Targeting epidermal growth factor receptor in tumors: From conventional monoclonal antibodies via heavy chain-only antibodies to nanobodies", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (20111028), vol. 45, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.EJPS.2011.10.015, ISSN 0928-0987, pages 399 - 407, XP028887665 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejps.2011.10.015 | [A] - K. GUNASEKARAN ET AL, "Enhancing Antibody Fc Heterodimer Formation through Electrostatic Steering Effects: APPLICATIONS TO BISPECIFIC MOLECULES AND MONOVALENT IgG", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20100618), vol. 285, no. 25, doi:10.1074/jbc.M110.117382, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 19637 - 19646, XP055001947 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M110.117382 | International search | [YP]WO2012058768 (ZYMEWORKS INC [CA], et al); | [XP]WO2013002362 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); | Examination | WO2006064136 | WO2009089004 | by applicant | EP0003089 | US4347935 | US4474893 | WO8605807 | US4676980 | US4714681 | WO8901036 | EP0307434 | EP0367166 | US4925648 | EP0368684 | WO9100360 | EP0413622 | WO9106570 | EP0439095 | WO9205793 | US5112946 | WO9208802 | US5122464 | WO9220373 | US5223409 | WO9315199 | WO9315200 | WO9316185 | WO9317715 | WO9321232 | WO9404690 | US5322798 | US5336603 | US5341215 | US5349053 | US5359046 | US5447851 | US5464581 | US5474981 | US5483469 | WO9604388 | US5571894 | US5573920 | US5587458 | US5601819 | US5602039 | US5605793 | US5622929 | US5643796 | WO9734631 | US5807715 | US5811238 | US5830721 | US5834252 | US5837458 | WO0061739 | US6211477 | WO0129246 | US6268125 | US6289286 | WO0177137 | US6373577 | WO0231140 | WO0230954 | EP1229125 | WO02070007 | US2003115614 | US6602684 | WO03075957 | US2003190311 | WO2004029207 | US6737056 | WO2004068820 | WO2005018629 | US2005064514 | WO2006003388 | WO2006030220 | US20020113929 | US20020277370 |