EP2917735 - METHOD FOR PREDICTION OF AN IMMUNE RESPONSE AGAINST MISMATCHED HUMAN LEUKOCYTE ANTIGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UMC Utrecht Holding B.V. Yalelaan 40 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPIERINGS, Hendrikus Theodorus Van der Heijdenlaan 4A NL-3705 EG Zeist / NL | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | [2018/29] |
Former [2015/38] | Buchanan, Luke Noel Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 13788993.7 | 08.11.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013EP73386 | Priority number, date | EP20120075124 | 08.11.2012 Original published format: EP 12075124 | EP20120075125 | 08.11.2012 Original published format: EP 12075125 | US201261724103P | 08.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261724103 P | EP20120194008 | 23.11.2012 Original published format: EP 12194008 | US201261729440P | 23.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261729440 P | EP20130075011 | 24.01.2013 Original published format: EP 13075011 | [2015/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014072467 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2917735 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2917735 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2917735 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, C12Q1/6881, G06F19/18, G06F19/10, G16H50/20, G16H50/30 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
G16B20/20 (EP,US);
G01N33/6878 (EP,CN,US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12Q1/6881 (US);
G16B20/00 (EP,US);
G16B99/00 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (US);
G01N2333/70539 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/38] | G01N33/68, G06F19/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE EINER IMMUNANTWORT GEGEN NICHT ÜBEREINSTIMMENDE HUMANE LEUKOZYTENANTIGENE | [2018/16] | English: | METHOD FOR PREDICTION OF AN IMMUNE RESPONSE AGAINST MISMATCHED HUMAN LEUKOCYTE ANTIGENS | [2015/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉVISION D'UNE RÉPONSE IMMUNITAIRE CONTRE DÉPAREILLÉS ANTIGÈNES D'HISTOCOMPATIBILITÉ HUMAINS | [2018/16] |
Former [2015/38] | VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE EINER IMMUNANTWORT GEGEN NICHT ZUSAMMENPASSENDE HUMANE LEUKOZYTENANTIGENE | ||
Former [2015/38] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION D'UNE RÉPONSE IMMUNITAIRE CONTRE DES ANTIGÈNES DE LEUCOCYTES HUMAINS MÉSAPPARIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 18.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2016 | Observations by third parties | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.04.2019
18.04.2019
ADMISSIBLE DRK-Blutspendedienst Baden-Württemberg-Hessen gemeinnützige GmbH Gunzenbachstrasse 35 76530 Baden-Baden / DE Opponent's representative Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/21] | 16.05.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.09.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.09.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.08.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 18.02.2021 | Appeal received No. T0175/21 | 09.03.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2013 | AL | 18.07.2018 | AT | 18.07.2018 | CY | 18.07.2018 | CZ | 18.07.2018 | DK | 18.07.2018 | EE | 18.07.2018 | ES | 18.07.2018 | FI | 18.07.2018 | HR | 18.07.2018 | IT | 18.07.2018 | LT | 18.07.2018 | LV | 18.07.2018 | MC | 18.07.2018 | MK | 18.07.2018 | PL | 18.07.2018 | PT | 18.07.2018 | RO | 18.07.2018 | RS | 18.07.2018 | SE | 18.07.2018 | SI | 18.07.2018 | SK | 18.07.2018 | SM | 18.07.2018 | TR | 18.07.2018 | BG | 18.10.2018 | NO | 18.10.2018 | GR | 19.10.2018 | IE | 08.11.2018 | LU | 08.11.2018 | MT | 08.11.2018 | IS | 18.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PT | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
MT | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
MT | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
MT | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 18.07.2018 | |
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 18.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2011135617 (KRUSE CAROL A [US]) [X] 1,4-12,14,15,17,18,21,24-39 * whole document, especially par. 74-82, 85, example 7, 12 * [Y] 1-39; | [X] - CLAAS F H J, "Predictive parameters for in vivo alloreactivity", TRANSPLANT IMMUNOLOGY, XX, XX, (20020801), vol. 10, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/S0966-3274(02)00060-6, pages 137 - 142, XP002249197 [X] 1,4-12,14,15,17,18,21,24-39 * whole document, especially abstract, p. 140, col. 1, par. 2- col. 2, par. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0966-3274(02)00060-6 | [X] - RENÉ J DUQUESNOY, "HLAMatchmaker: a molecularly based algorithm for histocompatibility determination. I. Description of the algorithm", HUMAN IMMUNOLOGY, (20020501), vol. 63, no. 5, doi:10.1016/S0198-8859(02)00382-8, ISSN 0198-8859, pages 339 - 352, XP055097515 [X] 1,4-12,14,15,17,18,21,24-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0198-8859(02)00382-8 | [Y] - MARLIES K.A DANKERS ET AL, "The HLA-DR phenotype of the responder is predictive of humoral response against HLA class i antigens", HUMAN IMMUNOLOGY, (20040101), vol. 65, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.humimm.2003.09.017, ISSN 0198-8859, pages 13 - 19, XP055097516 [Y] 1-39 * whole document, especially p. 14, col. 1, par. 3 - col. 2, par. 5; p. 15, col. 1, par. 1 - p. 17, col. 1, bridging par.; p. 18, col. 1, par. 1 - col. 2, par. 1; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.humimm.2003.09.017 | [A] - PAPASSAVAS A C, "HLA peptide-mediated strategies for modulation of cellular and humoral immune response in transplantation", CURRENT PHARMACOGENOMICS, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, US, (20030301), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.2174/1570160033378330, ISSN 1570-1603, pages 17 - 36, XP009088516 [A] 1-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1570160033378330 | [A] - REINSMOEN N L, "Cellular methods used to evaluate the immune response in transplantation", TISSUE ANTIGENS, MUNKSGAARD, COPENHAGEN, DK, (20020801), vol. 59, no. 4, doi:10.1034/J.1399-0039.2002.590401.X, ISSN 0001-2815, pages 241 - 250, XP002249198 [A] 1-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1399-0039.2002.590401.x | [A] - URBAN SESTER ET AL, "Rapid Identification of Preformed Alloreactive T Cells for Use in a Clinical Setting", TRANSPLANTATION, (20040801), vol. 78, no. 4, doi:10.1097/01.TP.0000131949.59284.4D, ISSN 0041-1337, pages 607 - 614, XP055058763 [A] 1-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.TP.0000131949.59284.4D | [A] - WANG PENG ET AL, "A systematic assessment of MHC class II peptide binding predictions and evaluation of a consensus approach", PLOS COMPUTATIONAL BIOLOGY, PUBLIC LIBRARY OF SCIENCE, US, (20080401), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:10.1371/JOURNAL.PCBI.1000048, ISSN 1553-734X, pages E1000048 - 1, XP002598739 [A] 1-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pcbi.1000048 | [A] - LIN HONG HUANG ET AL, "Evaluation of MHC-II peptide binding prediction servers: applications for vaccine research", BMC BIOINFORMATICS, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20081212), vol. 9, no. Suppl 12, doi:10.1186/1471-2105-9-S12-S22, ISSN 1471-2105, page S22, XP021041907 [A] 1-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2105-9-S12-S22 | Examination | - T. ANDREW BINKOWSKI ET AL, "Predicting HLA Class I Non-Permissive Amino Acid Residues Substitutions", PLOS ONE, (20120808), vol. 7, no. 8, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0041710, pages 1 - 12, XP055274538 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0041710 | - Chen Yanover ET AL, "HLA mismatches and hematopoietic cell transplantation: Structural simulations assess the impact of changes in peptide binding specificity on transplant outcome", Immunome research, England, (20110501), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 1 - 22, XP055274548 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4172/1745-7580.1000048 | - D. S. Deluca ET AL, "High-throughput minor histocompatibility antigen prediction", BIOINFORMATICS., GB, (20090701), vol. 25, no. 18, doi:10.1093/bioinformatics/btp404, ISSN 1367-4803, pages 2411 - 2417, XP055274554 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/btp404 | - A C Papassavas ET AL, "RECIPIENT SELECTION Definition of the Immunogenic HLA Epitopes Based on an Epitope Prediction Algorithm", Transplantation Proceedings, (20020901), vol. 34, pages 2049 - 2052, XP055274558 | - Henny G. Otten ET AL, "Predicted indirectly recognizable HLA epitopes presented by HLA-DR correlate with the de novo development of donor-specific HLA IgG antibodies after kidney transplantation", Human Immunology, (20130301), vol. 74, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.humimm.2012.12.004, ISSN 0198-8859, pages 290 - 296, XP055097518 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.humimm.2012.12.004 | other | - BINKOWSKI T.A. et al., "Predicting HLA Class I non permissive amino-acid residues substitutions", PLoS ONE, (20120000), vol. 7, no. 8, pages 1 - 12, XP055274538 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0041710 | - YANOVER C et al., "HLA mismatches and hematopoietic cell transplantation: Structural simulations assess the impact of changes in peptide binding specificity on transplant outcome", Immunome research, (20110000), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 1 - 22, XP055274548 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4172/1745-7580.1000048 | - DELUCA D.S., "High throughput minor histocompatibility antigen prediction", Databases and onthologies, (20090701), pages 1 - 7, XP055274554 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/btp404 | - PAPASSAVAS A.C. et al., "Recipient selection: Definition of the immunogenic HLA epitopes based on an epitope prediction algorithm", Transplantation Proceedings, (20020000), vol. 34, pages 2049 - 2052, XP055274558 | - OTTEN H.G. et al., "Predicted indirectly recognizable HLA epitopes presented by HLA-DR correlate with the de novo development of donor-specific HLA IgG antibodies after kidney transplantation", Human Immunology, (20130000), vol. 74, pages 290 - 296, XP055097518 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.humimm.2012.12.004 | Opposition | EP2917735 | - THUS KIRSTEN A. et al., "50-OR: Predicted indirectly recognizable HLA epitopes correlate with chronic graft-versus-host disease am relapse- related mortality in pediatric patients after cord blood transplantation", Human Immunology, (20130000), vol. 74, page 39, XP055584894 | - OTTEN H.G. et al., "Predicted indirectly recognizable HLA epitopes pre- sented by HLA-DR correlate with the de novo development of donor- specific HLA IgG antibodies after kidney transplantation", Human Im- munology, (20130000), vol. 74, pages 290 - 296, XP055097518 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.humimm.2012.12.004 | - BINKOWSKI T.A. et al., "Predicting HLA Class I non-permissive amino-acid residues substitutions", PLoS ONE, (20120000), vol. 7, no. 8, pages 1 - 12, XP055274538 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0041710 | - YANOVER C. et al., "HLA mismatches and hematopoietic cell transplanta- tion: Structural simulations assess the impact of changes in peptide binding specificity on transplant outcome", NIH Public Access, (20110000), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 1 - 22, XP055274548 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4172/1745-7580.1000048 | - DELUCA D.S., "Databases and onthologies: High throughput minor histocompatibility antigen prediction", Bioinformatics Advance Access, (20090701), pages 1 - 7, XP055274554 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/btp404 | - PAPASSAVAS A.C. et al., "Recipient selection: Definition of the immuno- genic HLA epitopes based on an epitope prediction algorithm", Trans- plantation Proceedings, (20020000), vol. 34, pages 2049 - 2052, XP055274558 |