EP2863591 - TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR MEDIA DATA STREAM AND THIN CLIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Hongling ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2015/17] | Application number, filing date | 13790066.8 | 02.07.2013 | WO2013CN78684 | Priority number, date | CN201210325236 | 05.09.2012 Original published format: CN201210325236 | [2015/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013170812 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2863591 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04L65/60 (US);
H04L51/04 (EP,US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/1001 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/17] | H04L12/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR MEDIADATENSTRÖME UND THIN-CLIENT DAFÜR | [2015/17] | English: | TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR MEDIA DATA STREAM AND THIN CLIENT | [2015/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION POUR TRAIN DE DONNÉES MULTIMÉDIA ET CLIENT LÉGER | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2015 | Translation filed | 13.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 04.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012218374 (MATULA VALENTINE C [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0049] ** paragraph [0067] * | International search | [A]US2011138069 (MOMCHILOV GEORGY [US], et al); | [X]CN102308560 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN102307153 (NING WANG); | [X]CN102611809 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |