EP2851136 - PRECURSOR DETECTION METHOD AND DEVICE OF STICK-SLIP PHENOMENON, AND METHOD FOR COLD-DRAWING A PIPE OR TUBE USING PRECURSOR DETECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/13] | SIGN DETECTION METHOD AND SIGN DETECTION DEVICE FOR STICK-SLIP PHENOMENON, AND COLD-DRAWING METHOD FOR PIPE USING THIS ADVANCE DETECTION METHOD | ||
[2018/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANADA, Takuya c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2018/28] |
Former [2015/13] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13790329.0 | 02.05.2013 | [2018/28] | WO2013JP62751 | Priority number, date | JP20120112342 | 16.05.2012 Original published format: JP 2012112342 | [2015/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013172208 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2851136 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2851136 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B21C1/24, B21C51/00 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
B21C51/00 (EP,CN,US);
B21C1/24 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEICHENERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN, ANZEICHENERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR RÜCKSTOSSPHÄNOMENE UND KALTZIEHVERFAHREN FÜR EIN ROHR UNTER ZUHILFENAHME DES ANZEICHENERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/04] | English: | PRECURSOR DETECTION METHOD AND DEVICE OF STICK-SLIP PHENOMENON, AND METHOD FOR COLD-DRAWING A PIPE OR TUBE USING PRECURSOR DETECTION METHOD | [2018/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE SIGNES PRÉCURSEURS DE PHÉNOMÈNE DE BROUTEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTIRAGE À FROID DE TUBE UTILISANT CE PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE SIGNES PRÉCURSEURS | [2018/04] |
Former [2015/13] | ANZEICHENERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN, ANZEICHENERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR RÜCKSTOSSPHÄNOMEN UND KALTZIEHVERFAHREN FÜR EIN ROHR MIT DIESEM FORTSCHREITUNGSERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2015/13] | SIGN DETECTION METHOD AND SIGN DETECTION DEVICE FOR STICK-SLIP PHENOMENON, AND COLD-DRAWING METHOD FOR PIPE USING THIS ADVANCE DETECTION METHOD | ||
Former [2015/13] | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE SIGNES ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE SIGNES DE PHÉNOMÈNE DE BROUTEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTIRAGE À FROID DE TUBE UTILISANT CE PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'AVANCEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2014 | Translation filed | 12.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 09.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2013 | AL | 11.07.2018 | AT | 11.07.2018 | CY | 11.07.2018 | CZ | 11.07.2018 | DK | 11.07.2018 | EE | 11.07.2018 | ES | 11.07.2018 | FI | 11.07.2018 | HR | 11.07.2018 | LT | 11.07.2018 | LV | 11.07.2018 | MC | 11.07.2018 | MK | 11.07.2018 | MT | 11.07.2018 | NL | 11.07.2018 | PL | 11.07.2018 | RO | 11.07.2018 | RS | 11.07.2018 | SE | 11.07.2018 | SI | 11.07.2018 | SK | 11.07.2018 | SM | 11.07.2018 | TR | 11.07.2018 | BG | 11.10.2018 | NO | 11.10.2018 | GR | 12.10.2018 | IS | 11.11.2018 | PT | 11.11.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 02.05.2013 | |
AL | 11.07.2018 | ||
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
MT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 02.05.2013 | |
AL | 11.07.2018 | ||
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 11.07.2018 | |
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 11.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS501956 (NIHON SEIHAN KK) [X] 1,6-8 * page 2, column 1; figures 1,2,3 * [Y] 2-5,9; | [XA]JPS507764 (--) [X] 1,6-8 * page 1, paragraphs 1,6; figures 1,4 * * page 2, paragraph 2 * [A] 5; | [A]JPS5354164 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-9* page 2; figure - *; | [YD]JPH10225712 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [YD] 2-5,9 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] - [0023] , [0024] , [0026] - [0028] - [0041] - [0043] - [0051]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]JPS501956 (NKK CORP.); | [A]JPH01170513 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al); | [A]JPH10225712 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [A]JP2004034147 (JFE STEEL KK); | [Y]JP2011174765 (CHUGOKU ELECTRIC POWER) | by applicant | JPH01170513 | JPH10225712 |