EP2852112 - MULTI-TENANT SYSTEM, SWITCH, CONTROLLER, AND PACKET TRANSFER METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAI Ryosuke c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Reeve, Nicholas Edward Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Reeve, Nicholas Edward Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13791085.7 | 15.05.2013 | WO2013JP63603 | Priority number, date | JP20120111881 | 15.05.2012 Original published format: JP 2012111881 | [2015/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013172391 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2852112 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/717, H04L12/70, H04L12/749, H04L12/741, H04L12/46, H04L29/08, H04L29/12, H04L12/933 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
H04L45/74 (EP,US);
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
H04L41/0809 (EP,US);
H04L41/0886 (EP,US);
H04L41/342 (EP);
H04L45/745 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/13] | H04L12/717, H04L12/70, H04L12/749 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Title | German: | SYSTEM, SCHALTER, STEUERUNG UND PAKETÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR MEHRERE TEILNEHMER | [2015/13] | English: | MULTI-TENANT SYSTEM, SWITCH, CONTROLLER, AND PACKET TRANSFER METHOD | [2015/13] | French: | SYSTÈME MULTI-LOCATAIRE, COMMUTATEUR, CONTRÔLEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT DE PAQUET | [2015/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2014 | Translation filed | 13.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 18.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 09.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010257263 (CASADO MARTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]CA2810660 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y] - JAYARAM MUDIGONDA ET AL, "NetLord", SIGCOMM, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20110815), doi:10.1145/2018436.2018444, ISBN 978-1-4503-0797-0, pages 62 - 73, XP058006640 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2018436.2018444 | [Y] - MARC LASSERRE FLORIN BALUS ALCATEL-LUCENT THOMAS MORIN FRANCE TELECOM ORANGE NABIL BITAR VERIZON YAKOV REKHTER, "Framework for DC Network Virtualization; draft-lasserre-nvo3-framework-01.txt", FRAMEWORK FOR DC NETWORK VIRTUALIZATION; DRAFT-LASSERRE-NVO3-FRAMEWORK-01.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20120312), pages 1 - 23, XP015081907 [Y] 1-10 * Chapters 1 - 4 * | International search | [A]JP2001136198 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2006128803 (JAPAN TELECOM CO LTD); | [A]WO2010115060 (NICIRA NETWORKS [US]); | [A]WO2011142972 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]); | [AE]WO2013069133 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2009152953 | JP2012111881 |