EP2851026 - OVERLAPPING BIPOLAR ELECTRODE FOR HIGH-FREQUENCY HEAT TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STARmed Co., Ltd. 901-1, Ilsantechno Town, 1141-1, Baekseok-Dong Ilsandong-Gu Goyang-Si, 410-722 / KR | For all designated states Shin, Kyong Min Hongjewon Hyundai Apt. 113-1702 459 Hongje-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-090 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | For all designated states STARmed Co., Ltd. 901-1, Ilsantechno Town, 1141-1, Baekseok-Dong Ilsandong-Gu Goyang-Si, 410-722 / KR | ||
For all designated states Shin, Kyong Min 113-1702 Hongjewon Jyundai Apt. 459 Hongje-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-090 / KR | |||
Former [2017/38] | For all designated states STARmed Co., Ltd. 901-1, Ilsantechno Town, 1141-1, Baekseok-Dong Ilsandong-Gu Goyang-Si, 410-722 / KR | ||
For all designated states Shin, Kyung Min 113-1702 Hongjewon Hyundai Apt. 459 Hongje-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-090 / KR | |||
Former [2015/47] | For all designated states STARmed Co., Ltd. 901-1, Ilsantechno Town, 1141-1, Baekseok-Dong Ilsandong-Gu Goyang-Si, 410-722 / KR | ||
For all designated states Shin, Kyong-Min 113-1702 Hongjewon Hyundai Apt. 459, Hongje-dong Seodaemun-ku Seoul 120-090 / KR | |||
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Taewoong Medical Co., Ltd. Gojeong-ro 14 Wolgot-myeon Gimpo-si, Gyeonggi-do 415-873 / KR | ||
For all designated states Shin, Kyong-Min 113-1702 Hongjewon Hyundai Apt. 459, Hongje-dong Seodaemun-ku Seoul 120-090 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Kyong Min Hongjewon Hyundai Apt. 113-1702 459 Hongje-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-090 / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Kyung Hoon 111-702, 11 Pungnyeon-ro Gimpo-si Gyeonggi-do 415-738 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Dong Un Chodangmaeul Jugong Apt. 101-1504 1598 Janggidong Gimpo-si Gyeonggi-do 415-781 / KR | [2018/13] |
Former [2015/42] | 01 /
SHIN, Kyung Min Hongjewon Hyundai Apt. 113-1702 459 Hongje-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-090 / KR | ||
02 /
SHIN, Kyung Hoon 111-702, 11 Pungnyeon-ro Gimpo-si Gyeonggi-do 415-738 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Dong Un Chodangmaeul Jugong Apt. 101-1504 1598 Janggidong Gimpo-si Gyeonggi-do 415-781 / KR | |||
Former [2015/38] | 01 /
SHIN, Kyung Min Hongjewon Hyundai Apt. 113-1702 459 Hongje-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-090 / KR | ||
02 /
SHIN, Kyung Hoon 111-702, 11 Pungnyeon-ro Gimpo-si Gyeonggi-do 415-738 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Dong Un Chodangmaeul Jugong Apt. 101-1504 1598 Janggidong Gimpo-si Gyeonggi-do 415-781 / KR | |||
Former [2015/13] | 01 /
SHIN, Kyung Min Hongjewon Hyundai Apt. 113-1702 459 Hongje-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-090 / KR | ||
02 /
SHIN, Kyung Hoon Pungnyeonmaeul Sambo Apt. 114-1404 21/1 857 Saudong Gimpo-si Gyeonggi-do 415-738 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Dong Un Chodangmaeul Jugong Apt. 101-1504 1598 Janggidong Gimpo-si Gyeonggi-do 415-781 / KR | Representative(s) | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Paul-Gerhardt-Allee 50 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/07] | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/13] | Klinski, Robert Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13791420.6 | 10.05.2013 | [2018/07] | WO2013KR04143 | Priority number, date | KR20120053127 | 18.05.2012 Original published format: KR 20120053127 | [2015/13] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013172600 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2851026 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2851026 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2851026 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61N1/06, A61B18/00, A61B18/16, A61B18/12 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
A61B18/1477 (EP,US);
A61N1/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61B18/14 (KR,US);
A61B18/1206 (US);
A61B2018/00023 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00529 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00595 (EP,US);
A61B2018/126 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/13] | A61B18/14, A61N1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERLAPPENDE BIPOLARE ELEKTRODE FÜR HOCHFREQUENZWÄRMEBEHANDLUNG | [2015/13] | English: | OVERLAPPING BIPOLAR ELECTRODE FOR HIGH-FREQUENCY HEAT TREATMENT | [2015/13] | French: | ÉLECTRODE BIPOLAIRE EN CHEVAUCHEMENT POUR TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE HAUTE FRÉQUENCE | [2015/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2014 | Translation filed | 17.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 11.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.02.2018 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.05.2013 | AL | 14.02.2018 | AT | 14.02.2018 | CY | 14.02.2018 | CZ | 14.02.2018 | DK | 14.02.2018 | EE | 14.02.2018 | FI | 14.02.2018 | HR | 14.02.2018 | LT | 14.02.2018 | LV | 14.02.2018 | MC | 14.02.2018 | MK | 14.02.2018 | NL | 14.02.2018 | PL | 14.02.2018 | PT | 14.02.2018 | RO | 14.02.2018 | RS | 14.02.2018 | SE | 14.02.2018 | SI | 14.02.2018 | SK | 14.02.2018 | SM | 14.02.2018 | TR | 14.02.2018 | IE | 10.05.2018 | LU | 10.05.2018 | MT | 10.05.2018 | BG | 14.05.2018 | NO | 14.05.2018 | GR | 15.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | IS | 14.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 10.05.2013 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MK | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 10.05.2018 | ||
MT | 10.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 10.05.2013 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 10.05.2018 | ||
MT | 10.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 10.05.2018 | ||
MT | 10.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 10.05.2018 | ||
MT | 10.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 10.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 10.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 10.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9411059 (AMERICAN CARDIAC ABLATION [US]) [X] 1,2 * figures 2,3,4 *; | [X]US164184 (J. KIDDER) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [X]WO0158372 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 7, line 16 - line 35; figures 3,4 *; | [X]WO2009121017 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 12-15b *; | [X]WO9855046 (ADIANA INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 8 *; | [Y]US5972026 (LAUFER MICHAEL D [US], et al) [Y] 4,5 * figure 2 *; | [XYI]EP1562506 (BARD INC C R [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029]; figure 4; claims 1,6,7 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * [Y] 4,5 [I] 3 | International search | [A]US2002099366 (DAHLA ROBERT H [US], et al); | [X]WO2005065559 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [A]JP3848122B (NIHON MEDIX); | [A]KR100973307B (CHUNG-ANG UNIVERSITY INDUSTRY-ACADEMY COOPERATION FOUNDATION ET AL.); | [A]US2011264085 (SATAKE SHUTARO [JP]) |