EP2916688 - DRAWER PULL OUT GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius Blum GmbH Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIOLAND, Wilfried Hornstrasse 3 A-6974 Gaissau / AT | 02 /
GREUSSING, Ulrich Oberdorf 278 A-6874 Bizau / AT | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Postfach 85 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Postfach 85 6010 Innsbruck / AT | ||
Former [2015/38] | Gangl, Markus, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Straße 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 13792572.3 | 14.10.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013AT00169 | Priority number, date | AT20120001200 | 12.11.2012 Original published format: AT 12002012 | [2015/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014071425 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2916688 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2916688 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/10 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
A47B88/493 (EP,US);
A47B88/40 (US);
A47B88/437 (EP,US);
A47B88/57 (US);
A47B2210/0045 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0059 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUBLADENAUSZIEHFÜHRUNG | [2015/38] | English: | DRAWER PULL OUT GUIDE | [2015/38] | French: | GLISSIÈRE TÉLESCOPIQUE DE TIROIR | [2015/38] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 30.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.10.2013 | AL | 21.09.2016 | CY | 21.09.2016 | CZ | 21.09.2016 | DK | 21.09.2016 | EE | 21.09.2016 | ES | 21.09.2016 | FI | 21.09.2016 | HR | 21.09.2016 | LT | 21.09.2016 | LV | 21.09.2016 | MC | 21.09.2016 | MK | 21.09.2016 | MT | 21.09.2016 | NL | 21.09.2016 | PL | 21.09.2016 | RO | 21.09.2016 | RS | 21.09.2016 | SE | 21.09.2016 | SI | 21.09.2016 | SK | 21.09.2016 | SM | 21.09.2016 | IE | 14.10.2016 | LU | 14.10.2016 | BE | 31.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | FR | 21.11.2016 | BG | 21.12.2016 | NO | 21.12.2016 | GR | 22.12.2016 | IS | 21.01.2017 | PT | 23.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/35] | HU | 14.10.2013 | |
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
MT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 14.10.2016 | ||
LU | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 21.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 14.10.2013 | |
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
MT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 14.10.2016 | ||
LU | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 21.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 14.10.2013 | |
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 14.10.2016 | ||
LU | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 21.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 14.10.2016 | ||
LU | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 21.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
LU | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 21.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 21.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 21.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 21.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0656182 (GOLD STAR CO [KR]) [X] 1,3-8,10,14,15 * abstract * * column 2, lines 33-49 * * column 3, lines 17-21 * [I] 13; | [AD]AT4518U (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [AD] 1,15 * abstract *; | [A]DE29616756U (REME MOEBELBESCHLAEGE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0694270 (ALFIT AG [AT]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | AT4518U | EP1470770 | EP0834270 | EP1190646 | EP0664983 | DE202008017061U |