EP2917008 - METHOD FOR REDUCING THE EMISSIONS OF VOLATILE ORGANIC COMPOUNDS FROM WOODEN MATERIALS AND WOODEN MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/38] | METHOD FOR REDUCING THE EMISSION OF VOLATILE ORGANIC COMPOUNDS FROM WOOD MATERIALS, AND WOOD MATERIALS | ||
[2022/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWISS KRONO Tec AG Museggstrasse 14 6004 Luzern / CH | [2017/12] |
Former [2015/38] | For all designated states Kronotec AG Haldenstrasse 12 6006 Luzern / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASCH, Joachim Alice und Hella Hirsch Ring 20 10317 Berlin / DE | 02 /
BOROWKA, Julia ul. Serbska 56 PL-68-200 Zary / PL | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | [2023/23] |
Former [2015/38] | Kröncke, Rolf, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13 a 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 13792612.7 | 06.11.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013EP73090 | Priority number, date | EP20120191376 | 06.11.2012 Original published format: EP 12191376 | [2015/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014072304 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2917008 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2917008 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B27N1/00, B27N3/00 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
B27N1/003 (EP,CN,US);
B27N1/00 (RU);
B27N3/00 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B27N3/08 (US);
D21H11/00 (US);
D21H17/63 (US);
D21J1/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER EMISSION VON FLÜCHTIGEN ORGANISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN AUS HOLZWERKSTOFFEN UND HOLZWERKSTOFFE | [2015/38] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING THE EMISSIONS OF VOLATILE ORGANIC COMPOUNDS FROM WOODEN MATERIALS AND WOODEN MATERIAL | [2022/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À LA RÉDUCTION DE L'ÉMISSION DE COMPOSÉS ORGANIQUES VOLATILES À PARTIR DE MATIÈRES DÉRIVÉES DU BOIS ET MATIÈRES DÉRIVÉES DU BOIS | [2022/10] |
Former [2015/38] | METHOD FOR REDUCING THE EMISSION OF VOLATILE ORGANIC COMPOUNDS FROM WOOD MATERIALS, AND WOOD MATERIALS | ||
Former [2015/38] | PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE RÉDUIRE L'ÉMISSION DE COMPOSÉS ORGANIQUES VOLATILS PROVENANT DE MATÉRIAUX DÉRIVÉS DU BOIS, ET MATÉRIAUX DÉRIVÉS DU BOIS | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 08.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.10.2021 | 26.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.01.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.01.2022 | 20.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2003080509 (NODA CORP) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0011] *; | [A]WO2005110742 (IAC IN NAT UNIV CHUNGNAM [KR], et al) [A] 1-15; | [AD]WO2006032267 (INST HOLZTECHNOLOGIE DRESDEN G [DE], et al)[AD] 1-15; | [AD]EP1852231 (KRONOTEC AG [CH]) [AD] 1-15 | Examination | CN101585204 | - DAS D ET AL, "Removal of volatile organic compound by activated carbon fiber", CARBON, ELSEVIER OXFORD, GB, (20040101), vol. 42, no. 14, doi:10.1016/J.CARBON.2004.07.008, ISSN 0008-6223, pages 2949 - 2962, XP004560170 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2004.07.008 | by applicant | WO2006032267 | EP1852231 |