EP2888365 - A NOVEL TOXIN IN TYPE A CLOSTRIDIUM PERFRINGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Guelph 50 Stone Road East Guelph, ON N1G 2W1 / CA | [2015/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRESCOTT, John 20 Mont Street Guelph, Ontario N1H 2A4 / CA | 02 /
MEHDIZADEH GOHARI, Iman c/o Ontario Veterinary College 419 Gordon Street PAHL (Pathobiology/Animal Health Laboratory) Bldg. 89 University of Guelph Guelph, Ontario N1G 2W1 / CA | 03 /
PARREIRA PINTO, Valeria 43 Irving Crescent Guelph Ontario N1G 5J1 / CA | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Arends, William Gerrit, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Callaghan, Dayle Anne Rouse IP Limited 11th Floor, Exchange Tower 1 Harbour Exchange Square London E14 9GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 13794617.4 | 23.05.2013 | WO2013CA00503 | Priority number, date | US201261650801P | 23.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261650801 P | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013173910 | Date: | 28.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2888365 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 28.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, A61K39/08, A61K39/385, A61P31/04, A61P37/04, C07K14/33, C07K16/12, C07K19/00, G01N33/569, A61K39/00, C12Q1/68 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/33 (EP,US);
A61K39/08 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K16/1282 (EP,US);
C12Q1/689 (US);
G01N33/56911 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6068 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/35 (EP,US);
C07K2319/50 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/112 (US);
C12Q2600/158 (US);
G01N2333/33 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | C12N15/31, A61K39/08, A61K39/385, A61P31/04, A61P37/04, C07K14/33, C07K16/12, C07K19/00, G01N33/569 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGES TOXIN IN CLOSTRIDIUM PERFRINGENS TYP A | [2015/27] | English: | A NOVEL TOXIN IN TYPE A CLOSTRIDIUM PERFRINGENS | [2015/27] | French: | NOUVELLE TOXINE DE CLOSTRIDIUM PERFRINGENS DE TYPE A | [2015/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 26.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 06.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/24] | 18.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/24] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees NO, BG, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BE, AT, AL | 26.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 26.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2015 | Decision despatched | 26.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 26.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 26.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2015 | Decision despatched | 26.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2008148166 (AUSTRALIAN POULTRY CRC PTY LTD [AU], et al); |