EP2916777 - INTERBODY INTERFERENCE IMPLANT AND INSTRUMENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Synthes Products, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, Massachusetts 02767-0350 / US | For all designated states Pavlov, Paul Louisenweg 5 6523 NA Nijmegen / NL | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAVLOV, Paul Louisenweg 5 6523 NA Nijmegen / NL | 02 /
OVERES, Tom Huslerhofstrasse 6 4513 Langendorf / CH | 03 /
BRUNNER, Peter Birkenweg 13a 3075 Rüfenacht / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/04] | 01 /
PAVLOV, Paul Louisenweg 5 NL-6523 NA Nijmegen / NL | ||
02 /
OVERES, Tom Huslerhofstrasse 6 CH-4513 Langendorf / CH | |||
03 /
BRUNNER, Peter Birkenweg 13a CH-3075 Rüfenacht / CH | |||
Former [2015/38] | 01 /
PAVLOV, Paul Louisenweg 5 NL-6523 NA Nijmegen / NL | ||
02 /
OVERES, Tom Huslerhofstrasse 6 CH-4513 Langendorf / CH | |||
03 /
BRUNNER, Peter Eimattstrasse 3 CH-4436 Oberdorf / CH | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | Orr, Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13795654.6 | 08.11.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013US69198 | Priority number, date | US201261725179P | 12.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261725179 P | [2015/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014074853 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2916777 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44, A61F2/46 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
A61B17/7055 (EP,US);
A61F2/4455 (EP,US);
A61F2/447 (EP,US);
A61F2/4611 (EP,US);
A61F2/30744 (EP,US);
A61F2/4405 (EP,US);
A61F2/4603 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3008 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30266 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30578 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30594 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30774 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30785 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30787 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3082 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30836 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30878 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30879 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30891 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30904 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30995 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Title | German: | ZWISCHENKÖRPERLICHES INTERFERENZIMPLANTAT UND INSTRUMENTE | [2015/38] | English: | INTERBODY INTERFERENCE IMPLANT AND INSTRUMENTATION | [2015/38] | French: | IMPLANT ET INSTRUMENTS D'INTERFÉRENCE INTERSOMATIQUE | [2015/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 16.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2017/18] | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/19] | 22.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6099531 (BONUTTI PETER M [US]) [X] 1,2 * columns 9-10; figures 8-17 *; | [X]WO2011008864 (LIFE SPINE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * pages 7-10; figures 1-7 *; | [XI]US2011264229 (DONNER EDWARD JEFFREY [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * paragraphs [0060] - [0072]; figures 2-7, 26A-28C * [I] 4,8; | [Y]US2012083883 (GINN RICHARD S [US]) [Y] 1,5-8 * paragraphs [0035] - [0038]; figures 13A-15B *; | [Y]US2012095560 (DONNER EDWARD JEFFREY [US]) [Y] 1,5-8 * paragraphs [0121] - [0203]; figures 41-52 *; | [A]US2012185049 (VARELA ARMANDO [US]) [A] 8* paragraph [0069] * |