EP2948911 - CUSTOMER CONTROLLED MANAGEMENT OF SHIPMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.05.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Parcel Service Of America, Inc. 55 Glenlake Parkway N.E. Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLINGENBERG, Robert Lee 3088 Woodwalk Drive S.E. Atlanta, Georgia 30339 / US | 02 /
BOWLING, Russell 2960 Creektree Lane Cumming, Georgia 30041 / US | 03 /
HARDESTY, Kristin Lynne 2200 Birmingham Road Alpharetta, Georgia 30004 / US | [2015/49] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/49] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13796181.9 | 04.11.2013 | [2015/49] | WO2013US68210 | Priority number, date | US201313746854 | 22.01.2013 Original published format: US201313746854 | US201313746862 | 22.01.2013 Original published format: US201313746862 | [2015/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014116320 | Date: | 31.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2948911 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, G06Q10/08 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
G06Q10/083 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/49] | G06Q30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Title | German: | TEILNEHMERGESTEUERTE VERWALTUNG VON SENDUNGEN | [2015/49] | English: | CUSTOMER CONTROLLED MANAGEMENT OF SHIPMENTS | [2015/49] | French: | GESTION COMMANDÉE PAR LE CLIENT D'EXPÉDITIONS | [2015/49] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 25.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.05.2018 | 02.05.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/39] | 24.05.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2012161730 (UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]WO2012161728 (UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]WO2012161731 (UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]WO2012161732 (UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]US2012095934 (KLINGENBERG ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US2012001013 (MORGAN WAYNE S [US]); | [A]US2012303542 (MARCUS STUART [US], et al); | [A]US2008004995 (KLINGENBERG ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US2013016636 (BERGER THOMAS R [US], et al); | [A]US2002178074 (BLOOM GREGG [US]); | [A]US2002103724 (HUXTER STEPHEN [US]); | [A]US2007156415 (FOTH THOMAS J [US], et al) |