EP2856158 - METHODS RELATED TO RITUXIMAB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 301 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2018/18] |
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 675 West Kendall Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBBLEE, John 341 Lake Avenue Newton Massachusetts 02461 / US | 02 /
COLLINS, Brian, Edward 30 Country Club Drive Arlington Massachusetts 02474 / US | 03 /
KAUNDINYA, Ganesh 215 Concord Road Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | 04 /
BOSQUES, Carlos, J. 40 Brattle Street 7 Arlington Massachusetts 02476 / US | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/15] | Application number, filing date | 13796989.5 | 31.05.2013 | WO2013US43710 | Priority number, date | US201261654235P | 01.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261654235 P | US201361784697P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361784697 P | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013181599 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2856158 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C40B30/04, C40B20/08, C12P21/06 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
C07K16/2887 (EP,US);
C07K2317/10 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/41 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/15] | G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Extension states | BA | 31.12.2014 | ME | 31.12.2014 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT RITUXIMAB | [2015/15] | English: | METHODS RELATED TO RITUXIMAB | [2015/15] | French: | MÉTHODES ASSOCIÉES AU RITUXIMAB | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 31.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 31.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 09.06.2016 | Observations by third parties | 24.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2017 | Observations by third parties | 23.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/49] | 26.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.01.2019 | 28.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2010130756 (TRANSGENE SA [FR], et al) [I] 1-12 * table 6 * | International search | [Y]US2005054832 (LAZAR GREGORY ALAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2011127322 (MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) | [Y] - INTERNET CITATION, "BIOSIMILARS", U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION PROTECTING AND PROMOTING YOUR HEALTH, (201202), URL: http://www.fda.gov/Drugs/DevelopmentApprovalProcess/HowDrugsareDevelopedandApproved, (20131210), XP055185007 | [Y] - MA ET AL., "Carbohydrate analysis of a chimeric recombinant monoclonal antibody by capillary electrophoresis with laser -induced fluorescence detection", ANAL CHEM, (19991115), vol. 71, no. 22, pages 5185 - 5192, XP055185009 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac990376z | other | WO2009058492 | EP2861068 | EP2856159 | WO2008128228 | - Huub Schellekens, "Biosimilar therapeutics- what do we need to consider?", NDT Plus, (20090000), vol. 2, no. Suppl 1, pages i27 - i36, XP055285377 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ndtplus/sfn177 | - TAN et al., "Characterization and comparison of commercially available TNF receptor 2-Fc fusion protein products", mAbs, (20120000), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 761 - 774, XP055285379 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.22276 | - "Glycosylation main approval issue with biosimilars", Generics and Biosimilars Initiative (GaBI), (20090901), URL: http://www.gabionline.net/Conferences/Glycosylation-main-approval-issue-with-biosimilars, XP055285383 | - Schiestl et al.,, "Acceptable changes in quality attributes of glycosylated biopharmaceuticals", Nature Biotechnology, (20110400), vol. 29, no. 4, pages 310 - 312, XP055285381 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1839 | - LATTOVA et al., "Alterations in Glycopeptides Associated with Herceptin Treatment of Human Breast Carcinoma MCF-7 and T-Lymphoblastoid Cells*", Molecular & Cellular Proteomics, (20110000), vol. 10, no. 9, XP055285374 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/mcp.M111.007765 |