EP2856507 - FRAME HOLDER FOR AN OPTICAL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essence Solar Solutions Ltd. 12 Abba Eben Boulevard Building D 4672530 Herzlia Pituach / IL | [2015/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASIN, Slava 13 Eliezer Fridman Street 4941920 Petach-Tikva / IL | 02 /
HELFAN, Ron 7 Fishman Maimon Street 6423607 Tel-Aviv / IL | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 13797339.2 | 29.05.2013 | WO2013IL50458 | Priority number, date | US201261652332P | 29.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261652332 P | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013179286 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2856507 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 05.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/054 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
H01L31/052 (EP,US);
H01L31/02008 (EP,US);
H01L31/0543 (EP,US);
H05K1/0203 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H05K1/05 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10143 (EP,US);
Y02E10/52 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/15] | H01L31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Title | German: | RAHMENHALTER FÜR EIN OPTISCHES ELEMENT | [2015/15] | English: | FRAME HOLDER FOR AN OPTICAL ELEMENT | [2015/15] | French: | SUPPORT DE CADRE DESTINÉ À UN ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 28.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/51] | 14.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1959505 (TRIDONICATCO OPTOELECTRONICS G [AT]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10,12,13,15 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1,2,3 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] *; | [X]US8026440 (GORDON ROBERT [US]) [X] 1,4-6,12-15 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 6; figures 4, 12 *; | [X]WO2011036323 (ABENGOA SOLAR NEW TECH SA [ES], et al) [X] 1,4-7,12,13,15 * the whole document *; | [XP]EP2482331 (ABENGOA SOLAR NEW TECH SA [ES]) [XP] 1,4-7,12,13,15 * paragraph [0072]; figures 6, 10b * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0058] *; | [XI]US2009107541 (LINKE EDWARD J [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,12,13,15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025]; figures 2, 3, 4 * * paragraph [0023] * [I] 9; | [X]JPH0983018 (NIPPON DENYO KK) [X] 1,5,7,8,10-13,15 * paragraph [0016]; figures 3, 4 *; | [X]US2005249463 (WILSON ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10-13,15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [X]US2009101207 (MILBOURNE ET AL.); | [A]US2003067264 (TAKEKUMA); | [A]US2010326494 (OKAMOTO); | [A]US2009114265 (MILBOURNE ET AL.) |