EP2859067 - METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR SYNERGISTIC SCAVENGING OF HYDROGEN SULPHIDE AND MERCAPTANS FROM A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/16] | SYNERGISTIC H2S SCAVENGERS | ||
[2017/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker Hughes, a GE company, LLC P.O Box 4740 Houston, TX 77210 / US | [2018/25] |
Former [2015/16] | For all designated states Baker Hughes Incorporated P. O. Box 4740 Houston, TX 77210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHRER, Scott, E. 143 N. Piney Plains Circle The Woodlands, TX 77382 / US | 02 /
RAMACHANDRAN, Sunder 2850 Field Line Drive Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US | 03 /
JOVANCICEVIC, Vladimir 2231 Shade Crest Drive Richmond, TX 77469 / US | [2015/16] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2015/16] | Hoffmann, Benjamin Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13797632.0 | 23.05.2013 | [2018/25] | WO2013US42390 | Priority number, date | US201261652515P | 29.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261652515 P | US201313900269 | 22.05.2013 Original published format: US201313900269 | [2015/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013181056 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2859067 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2859067 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C10G29/06, C09K8/52, C10L3/10, B01D53/14 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
B01D53/1493 (EP,US);
B01D53/1468 (EP,US);
B01D53/1487 (EP,US);
C10G29/20 (EP,US);
B01D2252/10 (EP,US);
B01D2252/20426 (EP,US);
B01D2252/205 (EP,US);
B01D2252/504 (EP,US);
B01D2252/606 (EP,US);
B01D2257/304 (EP,US);
B01D2257/306 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1033 (EP,US);
C10G2300/202 (EP,US);
C10G2300/207 (EP,US);
C10G2400/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/16] | C10G29/06, C09K8/52, C10L3/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR SYNERGISTISCHES REINIGEN EINES FLUID VON SCHWEFELWASSERSTOFF UND MERKAPTANEN | [2017/51] | English: | METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR SYNERGISTIC SCAVENGING OF HYDROGEN SULPHIDE AND MERCAPTANS FROM A FLUID | [2017/51] | French: | MÉTHODE ET COMPOSITION POUR LA SÉPARATION SYNERIQUE D'HYDROGÈNE SULFURÉ ET DE MERCAPTANS D'UN FLUIDE | [2017/51] |
Former [2015/16] | SYNERGISTISCHE H2S-SCAVENGER | ||
Former [2015/16] | SYNERGISTIC H2S SCAVENGERS | ||
Former [2015/16] | PIÈGES DE H2S SYNERGIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 04.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.08.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.05.2013 | AL | 20.06.2018 | AT | 20.06.2018 | CY | 20.06.2018 | CZ | 20.06.2018 | DK | 20.06.2018 | EE | 20.06.2018 | ES | 20.06.2018 | FI | 20.06.2018 | HR | 20.06.2018 | IT | 20.06.2018 | LT | 20.06.2018 | LV | 20.06.2018 | MC | 20.06.2018 | MK | 20.06.2018 | MT | 20.06.2018 | NL | 20.06.2018 | PL | 20.06.2018 | RO | 20.06.2018 | RS | 20.06.2018 | SE | 20.06.2018 | SI | 20.06.2018 | SK | 20.06.2018 | SM | 20.06.2018 | TR | 20.06.2018 | BG | 20.09.2018 | GR | 21.09.2018 | IS | 20.10.2018 | PT | 22.10.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 23.05.2013 | |
AL | 20.06.2018 | ||
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CY | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
MT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 23.05.2013 | |
AL | 20.06.2018 | ||
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CY | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CY | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 20.06.2018 | |
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005109210 (DAVIS STEPHEN L [CA], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0055] - [0065] *; | [Y]US2012012507 (COMPTON DENNIS R [US], et al) [Y] 1-9* paragraphs [0008] , [ 0016] , [ 0024] - [0033] * | International search | [A]US5354453 (BHATIA KISHAN [US]); | [Y]US2005109210 (DAVIS STEPHEN L [CA], et al); | [A]US2008056974 (SALMA TAUSEEF [US], et al); | [A]US2011139686 (COMPTON DENNIS R [US], et al); | [Y]US2012012507 (COMPTON DENNIS R [US], et al) | by applicant | US2005109210 | US2012012507 |