EP2854562 - FOOD COMPOSITION AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Mills, Inc. PO Box 1113 Number One General Mills Boulevard Minneapolis, Minnesota 55440 / US | [2015/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALUSKA, Peter 788 Meadow Drive Hudson, WI 54016 / US | 02 /
GUGGER, Eric, T. 13571 Birch Road Rogers, MN 55374 / US | 03 /
REITER, Christian, E. 2515 Blaisdell Avenue Apt. 201 Minneapolis, MN 55404 / US | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13798189.0 | 24.05.2013 | WO2013US42562 | Priority number, date | US201261654344P | 01.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261654344 P | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013181077 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2854562 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/16, A23L1/053, // A23L1/0532, A23L1/01 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
A23L5/19 (EP,US);
A23L29/256 (EP,US);
A23L33/21 (EP,US);
A23L33/30 (EP,US);
A23L7/109 (EP,US);
A23L19/09 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/15] | A23L1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Title | German: | NAHRUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2015/15] | English: | FOOD COMPOSITION AND METHOD | [2015/15] | French: | COMPOSITION ALIMENTAIRE ET MÉTHODE | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 01.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 01.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 21.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4544563 (LECHTHALER JUERG [CH]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5492712 (SILVER SHMUEL [IL], et al) [Y] 1-12* the whole document *; | [Y]US5759607 (CHAWAN DHYANESHWAR BHUJANGARAO [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0927519 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0004] - [0028]; example -; claim - *; | [Y]AU757419B (NESTLE SA) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2004012525 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005260321 (WESTON MARK E [US]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0017]; claim - *; | [X]WO2005112664 (MATTHEWS BERNARD LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 3; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2010022764 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-12 * example -; claim - * | International search | [Y]US6596331 (NOBUYASU YOSHIO [JP], et al); | [X]US2005118326 (ANFINSEN JON R [US], et al); | [Y]US2005170059 (ALDRED DEBORAH L [GB], et al); | [Y]US2009317522 (NIELSEN HELGE HENRIK [DK], et al) |