EP2934980 - RAIL SYSTEM, COMPRISING A RAIL VEHICLE THAT CAN BE MOVED ALONG A RAIL SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Str. 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2019/17] |
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Sew-Eurodrive GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Str. 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, Günter Abergavennystraße 30 76684 Östringen / DE | 02 /
DEGEN, Dirk Gondelsheimer Straße 43 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 13798566.9 | 13.11.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013EP03414 | Priority number, date | DE20121024693 | 18.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012024693 | [2015/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014094943 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2934980 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2934980 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B61B3/02, B61B13/12, B61C13/04 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
B61B13/12 (EP,CN,US);
B61B3/02 (US);
B61C13/04 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | B61B3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIENENANLAGE, UMFASSEND EIN ENTLANG EINER SCHIENENSTRECKE BEWEGBARES SCHIENENFAHRZEUG | [2015/44] | English: | RAIL SYSTEM, COMPRISING A RAIL VEHICLE THAT CAN BE MOVED ALONG A RAIL SECTION | [2015/44] | French: | SYSTÈME FERROVIAIRE COMPRENANT UN VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE MOBILE LE LONG D'UNE VOIE FERRÉE | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 25.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2013 | AL | 24.04.2019 | CY | 24.04.2019 | CZ | 24.04.2019 | EE | 24.04.2019 | ES | 24.04.2019 | FI | 24.04.2019 | HR | 24.04.2019 | LT | 24.04.2019 | LV | 24.04.2019 | MC | 24.04.2019 | MK | 24.04.2019 | MT | 24.04.2019 | PL | 24.04.2019 | RO | 24.04.2019 | RS | 24.04.2019 | SI | 24.04.2019 | SK | 24.04.2019 | SM | 24.04.2019 | TR | 24.04.2019 | BG | 24.07.2019 | NO | 24.07.2019 | GR | 25.07.2019 | IS | 24.08.2019 | PT | 24.08.2019 | IE | 13.11.2019 | LU | 13.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 13.11.2013 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
MT | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 13.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 13.11.2013 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 13.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 13.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 13.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 13.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
LU | 13.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
LU | 13.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE232661 (G. LUTHER AKT.-GES. [DE]) [A] 1* page 1, line 1 - page 1, line 72; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0442248 (F SISTEMI AUTOMAZIONI FLESSIBI [IT]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 35; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE9200973U (CFC-FÖRDERSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 26 - page 17, line 35; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE29509605U (AFT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 20 - page 12, line 13; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE102007037764 (EISENMANN ANLAGENBAU GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 0019 - page 4, paragraph 0036; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP2172381 (EISENMANN ANLAGENBAU GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, paragraph 0022 - column 9, paragraph 0042; figures 1-5 * |