EP2928797 - PLAY-FREE SNAP BEARING FOR GRIPPERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KHS GmbH Juchostraße 20 44143 Dortmund / DE | [2019/47] |
Former [2015/42] | For all designated states KHS GmbH Juchostrasse 20 44143 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAHLDIECK, Andreas Haupersborn 36 55743 Idar-Oberstein / DE | [2015/42] | Application number, filing date | 13798572.7 | 16.11.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013EP03460 | Priority number, date | DE201210111763 | 04.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012111763 | [2015/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014086460 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2928797 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2928797 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/86 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
B65G47/847 (EP,US);
B65B43/46 (US);
B65B43/60 (US);
B65G2201/0244 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIELFREIE SCHNAPPLAGERUNG FÜR GREIFER | [2015/42] | English: | PLAY-FREE SNAP BEARING FOR GRIPPERS | [2015/42] | French: | MONTAGE PAR ENCLIQUETAGE SANS JEU POUR ÉLÉMENT DE PRÉHENSION | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 07.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2013 | AL | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | NL | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | AT | 16.11.2020 | GB | 16.11.2020 | IE | 16.11.2020 | LU | 16.11.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 16.11.2013 | |
AL | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
AT | 16.11.2020 | ||
GB | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 16.11.2020 | ||
LU | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 16.11.2013 | |
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
AT | 16.11.2020 | ||
GB | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 16.11.2020 | ||
LU | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
AT | 16.11.2020 | ||
GB | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 16.11.2020 | ||
LU | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
AT | 16.11.2020 | ||
GB | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 16.11.2020 | ||
LU | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
AT | 16.11.2020 | ||
GB | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 16.11.2020 | ||
LU | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
GB | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 16.11.2020 | ||
LU | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 16.11.2020 | ||
LU | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/14] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE202006004641U (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]DE102008055620 (KHS AG [DE]) [X] 1,5-14 * paragraphs [0025] , [0 26]; figure 3 *; | [A]EP2295352 (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 6 * | by applicant | DE29713510U | EP2279143 |