EP2925144 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING A BIOLOGICAL CONTROL AGENT AND AN INSECTICIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/41] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSCH, Wolfram Schlodderdicher Weg 77 51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
SPRINGER, Bernd Haferkamp 8 51061 Köln / DE | 03 /
THIELERT, Wolfgang Buschweg 69 51519 Odenthal / DE | 04 /
LÜTH, Peter Fischkaten 48 23970 Wismar / DE | 05 /
EIBEN, Ute Inselstr. 23c 23999 Malchow Poel / DE | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/41] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 13798698.0 | 03.12.2013 | [2015/41] | WO2013EP75336 | Priority number, date | EP20120195208 | 03.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12195208 | [2015/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014086758 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2925144 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/04, A01P7/00, A01N37/40, A01N37/42, A01N43/12, A01N43/36, A01N43/40, A01N43/56, A01N43/88, A01N47/30, A01N47/34 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
A01N43/12 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (US);
A01N47/06 (US);
A01N63/30 (EP,US);
A01N63/50 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/12, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N63/30, A01N37/40, A01N37/42, A01N43/12, A01N43/36, A01N43/40, A01N43/56, A01N43/88, A01N47/30, A01N47/34, A01N2300/00 (US);
A01N63/30, A01N63/50, A01N37/40, A01N37/42, A01N43/12, A01N43/36, A01N43/40, A01N43/56, A01N43/88, A01N47/30, A01N47/34, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N63/50, A01N63/23 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2015/41] | A01N63/04, A01P7/00, A01N43/12, A01N43/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUS EINEM BIOLOGISCHEN BEKÄMPFUNGSMITTEL UND EINEM INSEKTIZID | [2015/41] | English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING A BIOLOGICAL CONTROL AGENT AND AN INSECTICIDE | [2015/41] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT D'AGENT DE LUTTE BIOLOGIQUE ET D'INSECTICIDE | [2017/31] |
Former [2015/41] | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT UN AGENT DE LUTTE BIOLOGIQUE ET UN INSECTICIDE | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 12.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 20.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO9102051 (AUSTRALIAN TECHNOLOGICAL INNOV [AU]) [ID] 1-16 * page 1, lines 3-6 * * page 4, lines 20-29 * * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 12 * * page 7, lines 28-30 * * page 9, lines 24-31 * * page 11, lines 2-7; claim 25 *; | [ID]WO9621358 (PROPHYTA BIOLOG PFLANZENSCHUTZ [DE], et al) [ID] 1-16 * page 2, paragraphs 4-5 * * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 1 *; | [A]WO2012016989 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 1, lines 5-9 * * page 5, lines 28-29 ** Table A: composition A-146 *; | [XI]WO2012072696 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8-16 * page 1, lines 2-7;27 - page 2, line 20 * * page 3, line 5 * * page 5, lines 13-15 * * page 6, lines 1-3;14-15, * * page 16, lines 25-29 * * page 66, lines 8-13 * * page 67, lines 5-7 * * page 68, line 1 - page 69, line 7 * * page 71, lines 6-10 * * example 1; tables 1-1 * [I] 6,7; | [XP]WO2012171914 (BAYER IP GMBH [DE], et al) [XP] 1,2,5,8-16 * paragraphs [0005] - [0006] - [0009] , [0012] , [0015] - [0016] - [0042] , [0 48] , [0080] , [0083] , [0152] , [0153] , [0157] - [0159] - [0176]; example 1; tables 1-2 *; | [XP]WO2013087709 (BAYER IP GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-3,5,11-16 * page 1, lines 9-18 * * page 5, lines 7-8 * * page 11, line 20 * * Page 15: Nr. 118 * * page 21, line 29 - page 22, line 2 * * page 31, lines 30-32 * * example 4; table 4 *; | [I] - PERVEEN K ET AL, "Efficacy of pesticides, neem seed powder and bio-control agents on Meloidogyne incognita and growth and oil yield of Mentha arvensis", NEMATOLOGIA MEDITERRANEA, EDIZIONI E T S, IT, (20070601), vol. 35, no. 1, ISSN 0391-9749, pages 75 - 79, XP009178432 [I] 1,2,5-16 * page 75, column 1, paragraph 2 * * tables I,II * * page 78, column 1, paragraph 2; 4 - column 2, paragraph 1 * | [I] - THAMMAIAH N ET AL, "Biological Control of Burrowing Nematode (Radopholus similis) in Banana", JOURNAL OF MYCOLOGY AND PLANT PATHOLOGY, RAJASTHAN COLLEGE OF AGRICULTURE, RAJASTHAN AGRICULTURAL UNIVERSITY / INDIAN SOCIETY OF MYCOLOGY AND PLANT PATHOLOGY, INDIA, (20121201), vol. 42, no. 4, ISSN 0971-9393, pages 509 - 512, XP009178602 [I] 1,2,5-16 * page 509, column 2, paragraph 2 * * tables 1-5 * * page 512, column 1, paragraphs 2-3 * | by applicant | US4245432 | US4272417 | US4808430 | WO8910396 | WO9102051 | EP0539588 | WO9621358 | WO9633270 | WO9844140 | US5876739 | WO0026345 | WO0026356 | WO0131042 | WO0141558 | WO0151654 | US2001029014 | WO0228186 | WO0234946 | WO0236831 | WO0244407 | US2002102582 | US2002120964 | WO02080675 | US6468747 | WO02096882 | WO02100163 | WO03013224 | US2003097687 | WO03052073 | US2003126634 | US2003176428 | US2003188347 | WO03106457 | WO2004011601 | WO2004039986 | WO2004053062 | WO2004072235 | US2004172669 | WO2004074492 | WO2004099160 | WO2004099447 | US2004250317 | US2005039226 | WO2005035486 | US2005086719 | WO2005054479 | WO2005054480 | WO2005059103 | WO2005061720 | WO2005063094 | WO2005077934 | US2005188434 | WO2005085216 | US2005216969 | WO2005103266 | WO2005103301 | US2006059581 | US2006059590 | US2006070139 | WO2006043635 | US2006095986 | WO2006056433 | US2006130175 | US2006162007 | WO2006089633 | WO2006098952 | WO2006100288 | US2006230473 | WO2006108674 | WO2006108675 | WO2006128569 | WO2006128570 | WO2006128573 | WO2006128571 | WO2006128572 | WO2006130436 | WO2006128568 | US2006282915 | US2007028322 | WO2007017186 | WO2007024782 | WO2007027777 | US2007067868 | WO2007040280 | WO2007057407 | US2007143876 | WO2007075459 | WO2007091277 | WO2007101369 | WO2007115644 | WO2007115643 | WO2007115646 | WO2007140256 | WO2007142840 | US2007292854 | WO2007149134 | WO2008002872 | WO2008009360 | US2008028482 | US2008064032 | US2008070260 | WO2008054747 | WO2008066153 | WO2008067911 | US2008167456 | US2008196127 | WO2008104503 | WO2008112019 | WO2008114282 | WO2008122406 | US2008260932 | US2008289060 | US2008312082 | WO2008151780 | US2008320616 | WO2009049851 | US2009130071 | WO2009064652 | US2009137395 | WO2009100188 | US2009210970 | WO2009103049 | WO2009102873 | US2009217423 | WO2009111263 | WO2009116106 | US2009265817 | US2009300784 | WO2010005692 | WO2010006713 | JP2010018586 | US2010024077 | US2010050282 | WO2010024976 | US2010077501 | US2010080887 | WO2010037016 | WO2010069502 | WO2010074747 | WO2010074751 | WO2010077816 | WO2010076212 | WO2010080829 | US2010184079 | WO2010117737 | WO2010117735 | WO2011022469 | US2011067141 | WO2011034704 | WO2011049233 | CN102057925 | WO2011062904 | WO2011066384 | WO2011066360 | US2011138504 | WO2011075593 | WO2011075595 | WO2011084632 | WO2011084621 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, page 30 | - A. KHAN ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, (2003), vol. 227, pages 107 - 111 | - S. KIEWNICK, BIOLOGICAL CONTROL, (2006), vol. 38, pages 179 - 187 | - BAUR ET AL., PESTICIDE SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 51, pages 131 - 152 | - R. WEGLER, Chemie der Pflanzenschutz- und Schadlingsbekampfungsmittel, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1970), vol. 2, pages 401 - 412 | - COLBY, S.R., "Calculating Synergistic and antagonistic Responses of Herbicide Combinations", WEEDS, (1967), vol. 15, pages 20 - 22, XP001112961 |