EP2917003 - COATED SNAP CUTTER BLADE AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUGIMIYA, Michitomo 6-7-29 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa Tokyo 141-8684 / JP | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/38] | Application number, filing date | 13798791.3 | 08.11.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013US69179 | Priority number, date | JP20120247535 | 09.11.2012 Original published format: JP 2012247535 | [2015/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014074838 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2917003 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B26B9/00, B21D53/64 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
B26B9/00 (EP,US);
C23C16/34 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETES SCHNAPPSCHNEIDBLATT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2015/38] | English: | COATED SNAP CUTTER BLADE AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | [2015/38] | French: | LAME DE CUTTER RÉTRACTABLE REVÊTUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2015/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 02.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/50] | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2004078424 (IRWIN IND TOOL CO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,10,12-14,18-21 * page 12, lines 15-20; figures 2, 11C * * page 15, lines 19-26 * * page 26, lines 3-10 * * page 26, line 26 - page 27, line 29 * [Y] 5,9,11 [I] 8,15; | [Y]US2010088901 (GLANCEY JAMES L [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0039] , [0 40]; figures 3, 4 *; | [Y]GB2386909 (HARDIDE LTD [GB]) [Y] 9 * page 3, lines 23-25 *; | [Y]DE202008001869U (BECKER PETER [DE]) [Y] 11 * the whole document *; | [X]US2010071216 (NOVAK JOSEPH THOMAS [US]) [X] 1,6,17 * paragraphs [0034] , [0 37]; figures 1, 4 * | by applicant | US4063356 | US4170062 | JPH10146702 |