EP2920713 - DELIVERY AND DISPLAY OF PAGE PREVIEWS DURING PAGE RETRIEVAL EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazon Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 8102 Reno, NV 89507 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states Amazon Technologies Inc. Post Office Box 8102 Reno, NV 89507 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Rohit, Krishna 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109-5210 / US | 02 /
BRESSLER, Scott, Zachary 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109-5210 / US | 03 /
SHAM, Ivan King Yu 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109-5210 / US | 04 /
STEWART, Ian William 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109-5210 / US | 05 /
TAYLOR, Brett Richard 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109-5210 / US | 06 /
HILL, Peter Frank 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109-5210 / US | 07 /
NAIR, Aakarsh 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109-5210 / US | 08 /
REDDIE, Steven Michael 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109-5210 / US | 09 /
ARMSTRONG, Patrick Joseph 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109-5210 / US | 10 /
YOUNG, Samuel John 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109-5210 / US | 11 /
VASWANI, Ameet Nirmal 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109-5210 / US | 12 /
HAYDEN, Andrew 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109-5210 / US | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13798821.8 | 12.11.2013 | [2015/39] | WO2013US69733 | Priority number, date | US201261726510P | 14.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261726510 P | US201313841148 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313841148 | US201313901446 | 23.05.2013 Original published format: US201313901446 | US201313901359 | 23.05.2013 Original published format: US201313901359 | US201313901343 | 23.05.2013 Original published format: US201313901343 | [2015/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014078326 | Date: | 22.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2920713 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
G06F16/9574 (EP,US);
G06F16/9577 (EP,US);
G06F40/106 (EP,US);
G06F40/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Title | German: | LIEFERUNG UND ANZEIGE VON SEITE VORANSICHT SEITE WÄHREND EREIGNISSEN WIEDERAUFFINDUNG | [2015/39] | English: | DELIVERY AND DISPLAY OF PAGE PREVIEWS DURING PAGE RETRIEVAL EVENTS | [2015/39] | French: | DISTRIBUTION ET AFFICHAGE D'APERÇUS DE PAGE DURANT DES ÉVÉNEMENTS D'EXTRACTION DE PAGE | [2015/39] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 18.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2019 | 20.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/19] | 26.12.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6271840 (FINSETH JAMES LEE [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 3, line 55 - column 11, line 15 *; | [I]US6356908 (BROWN MICHAEL WAYNE [US], et al) [I] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [I] - Anonymous, "ShrinkTheWeb (STW) Website Previews Plugin", (20120710), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20120710154658/http://wordpress.org/extend/plugins/shrinktheweb-website-preview-plugin/screenshots/, (20140110), XP055095681 [I] 1-4 * the whole document * | [I] - Anonymous, "ShrinkTheWeb - Website Previews API Documentation", (20121029), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20121029152521/http://www.shrinktheweb.com/uploads/STW_API_Documentation.pdf, (20140110), XP055095675 [I] 1-4 * page 3 - page 4 * | Examination | US2012254727 |