EP2919668 - OCCLUSIVE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2015/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIVINO, Vincent 24436 Muela Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US | 02 /
BARDSLEY, Earl Frederick 6349 Camino Marinero San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | 03 /
RHEE, Richard 553 S. Sunnyhill Way Anaheim, CA 92808 / US | 04 /
KADAM, Madhur Arunrao 26136 Emyvale Ct. Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | 05 /
KULAK, Julie 34052 CALLITA DR DANA POINT CA 92629-2609 / US | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13798839.0 | 13.11.2013 | [2015/39] | WO2013US69955 | Priority number, date | US201261725768P | 13.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261725768 P | [2015/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014078458 | Date: | 22.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2919668 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
A61B17/12113 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B17/12 (KR);
A61B17/12022 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B17/12118 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B17/12159 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B17/12163 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B17/12186 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B17/1219 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61F2/95 (CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2015/39] | English: | OCCLUSIVE DEVICES | [2015/39] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'OCCLUSION | [2015/39] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 31.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/43] | 18.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/43] | Divisional application(s) | EP19173571.1 / EP3574850 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2008109057 (CALABRIA MARIE F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,10 * paragraph [0060]; figure 2 * [I] 3-6,9; | [XI]US2009112249 (MILES SCOTT D [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,10 * paragraph [0070]; figures 15,18B *[I] 6,9 | Examination | WO2010028300 | by applicant | US6168622 | US7507229 | US2011319926 | US8142456 | US2012330341 |