EP2920004 - SECURITY ELEMENT FOR A DOCUMENT OF VALUE AND/OR A SECURITY DOCUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bundesdruckerei GmbH Oranienstrasse 91 10969 Berlin / DE | [2015/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUTMANN, Roland Tischlerweg 28 14612 Falkensee / DE | 02 /
MOMBRÉE, Alexander Geßlerstrasse 4 10829 Berlin / DE | 03 /
KNEBEL, Michael Marienburgerstrasse 7 10405 Berlin / DE | 04 /
KUNATH, Christian Hindenburgdamm 32 12203 Berlin / DE | 05 /
EHREKE, Jens Peter-Hille-Strasse 107 12587 Berlin / DE | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/03] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstrasse 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2015/39] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 13798963.8 | 15.11.2013 | [2015/39] | WO2013EP73970 | Priority number, date | DE201210111054 | 16.11.2012 Original published format: DE102012111054 | [2015/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014076245 | Date: | 22.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2920004 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2920004 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/342, B42D25/387, B42D25/378, B42D25/351 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
B42D25/387 (EP,US);
B42D25/29 (US);
B42D25/342 (EP,US);
B42D25/351 (EP,US);
B42D25/378 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/39] | B44F1/10, B42D25/387, B42D25/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSELEMENT FÜR EIN WERT- UND/ODER SICHERHEITSDOKUMENT | [2015/39] | English: | SECURITY ELEMENT FOR A DOCUMENT OF VALUE AND/OR A SECURITY DOCUMENT | [2015/39] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE SÉCURITÉ POUR UN DOCUMENT DE VALEUR ET/OU DE SÉCURITÉ | [2015/39] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 19.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2013 | AL | 18.01.2017 | CY | 18.01.2017 | CZ | 18.01.2017 | DK | 18.01.2017 | EE | 18.01.2017 | HR | 18.01.2017 | LT | 18.01.2017 | LV | 18.01.2017 | MC | 18.01.2017 | MK | 18.01.2017 | MT | 18.01.2017 | RO | 18.01.2017 | RS | 18.01.2017 | SI | 18.01.2017 | SK | 18.01.2017 | SM | 18.01.2017 | TR | 18.01.2017 | BG | 18.04.2017 | NO | 18.04.2017 | GR | 19.04.2017 | IS | 18.05.2017 | PT | 18.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 15.11.2013 | |
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
TR | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 15.11.2013 | |
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 15.11.2013 | |
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.11.2013 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | HR | 18.01.2017 | |
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9747478 (THOMAS DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL [GB], et al) [X] 1-9,12,13 * page 5, lines 30 - 36 * * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 10 * * page 8, lines 24 - 29 * * page 9, lines 1 - 5 * * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 10 * * page 10, lines 32 - 36 * * page 11, lines 6 - 8 * * page 15, lines 5 - 12 * * page 17, line 33 - page 19, line 4 * * page 19, lines 7 - 21 * * page 21, lines 6 - 9; figure -; claims 8 - 14, 19-21,24,25,27,31 * [I] 10,11; | [XI]EP0967091 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [X] 1-5,7-9,12 * paragraphs [0012] , [0018] , [0019]; figure - * [I] 6,10,11,13; | [XAI]WO2011076361 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,12 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 5 * * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 2 * * page 4, lines 13 - 21 * * page 5, lines 23 - 25 * * page 9, line 12 - page 10, line 12 * * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 3; figure - * [A] 3,10,11 [I] 6,7,13; | [XAI]EP2384898 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,12,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0019] , [0033] , [0041] , [0042] , [0045] , [0046] , [0063] , [0064] , [0066]; figure -; claims 1, 6, 13, 18 * [A] 3,10,11[I] 4,6,7 |