EP2932449 - ELECTRONIC MANAGEMENT OF AN INVENTORY OF PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARBE, Thomas Feldstr. 21 b 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | 02 /
HÄPP, Claudia Margit-Schramm-Str. 7 80639 München / DE | 03 /
PIETSCH, Ingo Teuchertstr. 31 81829 München / DE | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 13799084.2 | 04.12.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013EP75542 | Priority number, date | DE201210222702 | 11.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012222702 | [2015/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014090655 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2932449 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VERWALTUNG EINES WARENBESTANDES | [2015/43] | English: | ELECTRONIC MANAGEMENT OF AN INVENTORY OF PRODUCTS | [2015/43] | French: | GESTION ÉLECTRONIQUE D'UNE RÉSERVE DE MARCHANDISES | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 10.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 29.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/22] | 12.01.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012101876 (TURVEY ROBERT R [US], et al) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [I]US2012278190 (BROWN PETER [GB]) [I] 1-11 * abstract * |