EP2928963 - DIELECTRIC ELECTROACTIVE POLYMERS COMPRISING AN IONIC SUPRAMOLECULAR STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danmarks Tekniske Universitet Anker Engelunds Vej 101 A 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKOV, Anne Ladegaard Dalgas Have 56 2. th. DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK | 02 /
HVILSTED, Søren Grundtmannsvej 4 DK-2970 Hørsholm / DK | 03 /
BÚRDALO, Lídia Gonzalez Guldbergsgade 24 3 tv. DK-2200 Copenhagen N / DK | [2016/46] |
Former [2015/42] | 01 /
SKOV, Anne Ladegaard Dalgas Have 56 2. th. DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK | ||
02 /
HVILSTED, Søren Grundtmannsvej 4 DK-2970 Hørsholm / DK | |||
03 /
BÚRDALO, Lídia Gonzalez Guldbergsgade 24 3 tv. DK-2200Copenhagen N / DK | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2016/46] | Inspicos P/S Kogle Allé 2 2970 Hørsholm / DK | ||
Former [2015/42] | Inspicos A/S Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45 2970 Hørsholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 13799564.3 | 04.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013EP75578 | Priority number, date | EP20120195690 | 05.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12195690 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014086885 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2928963 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2928963 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
H01B3/28 (EP,US);
C08L77/06 (US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
H01B3/307 (EP,US);
H10N30/857 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIELEKTRISCHE ELEKTROAKTIVE POLYMERE MIT SUPRAMOLEKULARER IONENSTRUKTUR | [2016/17] | English: | DIELECTRIC ELECTROACTIVE POLYMERS COMPRISING AN IONIC SUPRAMOLECULAR STRUCTURE | [2015/42] | French: | POLYMÈRES ÉLECTROACTIFS DIÉLECTRIQUES COMPRENANT UNE STRUCTURE SUPRAMOLÉCULAIRE IONIQUE | [2016/17] |
Former [2015/42] | DIELEKTRISCHE ELEKTROAKTIVE POLYMERE MIT EINER SUPRAMOLEKULAREN IONENSTRUKTUR | ||
Former [2015/42] | POLYMÈRES ÉLECTROACTIFS DIÉLECTRIQUES COMPRENANT UNE STRUCTURE IONIQUE SUPRAMOLÉCULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 03.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2013 | AL | 16.11.2016 | AT | 16.11.2016 | BE | 16.11.2016 | CY | 16.11.2016 | CZ | 16.11.2016 | DK | 16.11.2016 | EE | 16.11.2016 | FI | 16.11.2016 | HR | 16.11.2016 | IS | 16.11.2016 | LT | 16.11.2016 | LV | 16.11.2016 | MC | 16.11.2016 | MK | 16.11.2016 | NL | 16.11.2016 | PL | 16.11.2016 | RO | 16.11.2016 | RS | 16.11.2016 | SI | 16.11.2016 | SK | 16.11.2016 | SM | 16.11.2016 | TR | 16.11.2016 | LU | 04.12.2016 | MT | 04.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | BG | 16.02.2017 | GR | 17.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 04.12.2013 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IS | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
TR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LU | 04.12.2016 | ||
MT | 04.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 04.12.2013 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IS | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
LU | 04.12.2016 | ||
MT | 04.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 04.12.2013 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IS | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
LU | 04.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
LU | 04.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 16.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002128364 (MICHOT CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0091]; claims 6,11 * | by applicant | - MATYSEK ET AL., PROC. SPIE-EAPAD, SAN DIEGO, (2010), page 76420D | - SHANKAR ET AL., MACROMOL. RAPID COMM., (2007), vol. 28, pages 1142 - 1147 | - CARPI ET AL., ADV. FUNCT. MATER., (2008), vol. 18, pages 235 - 241 | - KUSSMAUL ET AL., ADV. FUNCT. MATER., (2011), vol. 21, pages 4589 - 4594 |