EP2922988 - POLYCRYSTALLINE SILICON THICK FILMS FOR PHOTOVOLTAIC DEVICES OR THE LIKE, AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guardian Glass, LLC 2300 Harmon Road Auburn Hills MI 48326 / US | [2018/02] |
Former [2015/40] | For all designated states Guardian Industries Corp. 2300 Harmon Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VEERASAMY, Vijayen, S. 756 Eagle Road Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US | 02 /
BRACAMONTE, Martin, D. 14511 Romine Road Carleton, MI 48117 / US | [2015/40] | Representative(s) | Hess, Peter K. G. Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2015/40] | Application number, filing date | 13799715.1 | 14.11.2013 | [2015/40] | WO2013US69980 | Priority number, date | US201213682786 | 21.11.2012 Original published format: US201213682786 | [2015/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014081604 | Date: | 30.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2922988 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C30B25/18, C23C16/02, C30B29/06, H01L21/02 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
H01L21/02595 (EP,US);
C23C16/0281 (EP,US);
C23C16/24 (EP,US);
C23C16/44 (EP,US);
C30B25/18 (EP,US);
C30B29/06 (EP,US);
H01L21/02422 (EP,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,US);
H01L21/02601 (EP,US);
H01L21/02672 (EP,US);
H01L29/04 (US);
H01L31/03682 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] | Title | German: | POLYKRISTALLINE SILICIUMDICKSCHICHTEN FÜR PHOTOVOLTAIKVORRICHTUNGEN ODER DERGLEICHEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2015/40] | English: | POLYCRYSTALLINE SILICON THICK FILMS FOR PHOTOVOLTAIC DEVICES OR THE LIKE, AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME | [2015/40] | French: | FILMS ÉPAIS EN SILICIUM POLYCRISTALLIN POUR DISPOSITIFS PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES OU SIMILAIRES, ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2015/40] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 11.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/34] | 17.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3651385 (KOBAYASHI ISAMU) [Y] 4,17 * column 2, line 27 - line 36 *; | [A]US6241817 (JANG JIN [KR], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-17 *; | [Y]EP1119053 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]) [Y] 1-21 * example 10 *; | [Y]US6777714 (MURAMATSU SHINICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,6,21 * column 6, line 61 - column 8, line 9 *; | [A]US2005012099 (COUILLARD JAMES G [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] *; | [Y]WO2012095311 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-21 * page 5, line 28 - line 31 *; | [A] - KIRIMURA HIROYA ET AL, "Study of low-temperature crystallization of amorphous Si films obtained using ferritin with Ni nanoparticles", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (20050623), vol. 86, no. 26, doi:10.1063/1.1954872, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 262106 - 262106, XP012066013 [A] 1,6,21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1954872 | Examination | US2011284861 |