EP2856608 - TRANSMITTING DEVICE, WIRELESS CHARGING SYSTEM COMPRISING TRANSMITTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING CHARGING PROCESS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYD Company Limited No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen 518118 / CN | [2015/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xinhua No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, He No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Ying No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Qingchun No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 05 /
CAI, Xinwei No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 06 /
YANG, Zaixing No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 07 /
CHEN, Dajun No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2015/15] | Application number, filing date | 13799883.7 | 16.05.2013 | WO2013CN75723 | Priority number, date | CN201210180427 | 04.06.2012 Original published format: CN201210180427 | CN201220259100U | 04.06.2012 Original published format: CN 201220259100 U | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013181985 | Date: | 12.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2856608 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02J5/00, H02J7/02 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
H02J7/00309 (EP,US);
H02J50/12 (EP,US);
H02J50/80 (EP,US);
H02J7/00302 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/15] | H02J17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DRAHTLOSES LADESYSTEM MIT DER ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES LADEVERFAHRENS DARIN | [2015/15] | English: | TRANSMITTING DEVICE, WIRELESS CHARGING SYSTEM COMPRISING TRANSMITTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING CHARGING PROCESS THEREOF | [2015/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION, SYSTÈME DE CHARGE SANS FIL COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN PROCESSUS DE CHARGE DE CELUI-CI | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 15.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/12] | 15.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2009011475 (HANRIM POSTECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 9,13 * paragraphs [0085] - [0086] * [A] 10,14; | [YA]US2009174263 (BAARMAN DAVID W [US], et al) [Y] 10,14 * paragraphs [0007] , [0036] , [0041] *[A] 1,2,11; | [XYI]US2011304216 (BAARMAN DAVID W [US]) [X] 1,3-8,12 * paragraphs [0049] - [0050] - [0059] , [0067] , [0070] , [0072] , [0077] - [0078]; figures 4,10,12 * [Y] 9,10,13,14 [I] 2,11,15 | International search | [X]WO2011086694 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]CN102280944 (SHANGHAI HONGLONG ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY); | [Y]CN102290873 (U1VIV CHONGQING); | [XP]CN202712982U (BYD CO LTD) | by applicant | US2011304216 |