EP2858438 - COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, WIRELESS BASE STATION AND USER TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.07.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2015/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
KISHIYAMA, Yoshihisa c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/15] | Application number, filing date | 13801003.8 | 30.05.2013 | WO2013JP65056 | Priority number, date | JP20120127184 | 04.06.2012 Original published format: JP 2012127184 | [2015/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013183542 | Date: | 12.12.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2858438 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04J11/00, H04W92/20, H04L5/00, H04L5/14 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L5/0035 (EP,US);
H04L5/0073 (EP,US);
H04L5/0085 (EP,US);
H04L5/0092 (EP,US);
H04L5/14 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/15] | H04W72/04, H04J11/00, H04W92/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, DRAHTLOSE BASISSTATION UND BENUTZERENDGERÄT | [2015/15] | English: | COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, WIRELESS BASE STATION AND USER TERMINAL | [2015/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, STATION DE BASE SANS FIL ET TERMINAL UTILISATEUR | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2014 | Translation filed | 10.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 10.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.06.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/49] | 10.07.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/49] | Divisional application(s) | EP18174012.7 / EP3383115 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010080139 (PALANKI RAVI [US], et al); |